Global Patent Index - EP 1491357 A2

EP 1491357 A2 2004-12-29 - Printing substrate having an optically anisotropic layer

Title (en)

Printing substrate having an optically anisotropic layer

Title (de)

Druckträger mit optisch doppelbrechender Schicht

Title (fr)

Support d'impression avec une couche optique birefringent

Publication

EP 1491357 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 04009617 A

Priority

DE 10328744 A

Abstract (en)

The print medium has an at least partial transparent anisotropic coating, especially a colorless doubly refracting coating, especially arranged on a layer-oriented structure. The anisotropic coating contains nematic liquid crystals. The medium has a partial area with a block embossing (BP) and/or an uncoated relief and/or a partial area with a conventional, optically isotropic clear lacquer. An independent claim is also included for a method of manufacturing a print medium.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Druckträger, insbesondere Daten- oder Informationsträger, der wenigstens teilbereichsweise mit einer transparenten, anisotropen Schicht, insbesondere einer optisch farblosen doppelbrechenden Schicht, versehen ist, insbesondere die auf einer schichtorientierenden Struktur angeordnet ist. Die Erfindung betrifft weiterhin ein Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Druckträgers mit einer wenigstens teilbereichsweise darauf angeordneten optisch anisotropen Schicht, bei dem mittels eines Druckverfahrens eine anisotrope Schicht, insbesondere doppelbrechende nematogene Flüssigkristalle umfassende Schicht, auf wenigstens einen Teilbereich des Druckträgers aufgetragen wird, der wenigstens eine schichtorientierende Struktur aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42D 15/00; B41M 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42D 15/10 (2006.01); B41M 3/14 (2006.01); B42D 15/00 (2006.01); G09F 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42D 25/364 (2013.01); B42D 25/26 (2014.10); B42D 25/29 (2014.10); B42D 2033/26 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24479 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24612 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1491357 A2 20041229; EP 1491357 A3 20050907; CA 2470288 A1 20041225; CN 1576055 A 20050209; DE 10328744 A1 20050113; JP 2005014613 A 20050120; RU 2004119365 A 20051210; RU 2345899 C2 20090210; US 2005037179 A1 20050217; US 2006292348 A1 20061228

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20101103

2007-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070614

2006-05-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2006-01-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KBA-METRONIC AG

2005-12-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20051025

2005-09-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-09-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK

2005-09-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 42D 15/00 A

2005-09-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 41M 3/14 B

2004-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK