Global Patent Index - EP 1491619 A1

EP 1491619 A1 2004-12-29 - Process for preparing a detergent

Title (en)

Process for preparing a detergent

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Tensiden

Title (fr)

Procédé de préparation de détergents

Publication

EP 1491619 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 03019852 A

Priority

EP 03019852 A

Abstract (en)

Preparation of a granular detergent having bulk density of at least 500 g/l involves adding at least one water-soluble salt to an aqueous sodium laurel sulfate to precipitate the sodium laurel sulfate; separating the precipitate; and drying the product.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 11/00; B01D 9/02; C07C 305/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 17/02 (2006.01); C11D 1/14 (2006.01); C11D 3/02 (2006.01); C11D 11/00 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

B01D 9/00 (2006.01); C07C 305/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/046 (2013.01); C11D 1/146 (2013.01); C11D 11/0082 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] DE 1131662 B 19620620 - LEUNA IAWALTER ULBRICHTIA VEB
  • [A] US 2337552 A 19431228 - HENKE CLYDE O
  • [X] DATABASE WPI Week 9638, Derwent World Patents Index; AN 1996-382429, XP002267726
  • [X] DATABASE WPI Week 8744, Derwent World Patents Index; AN 1987-311160, XP002267727
  • [X] DATABASE WPI Week 0031, Derwent World Patents Index; AN 2000-353662, XP002267728

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1491619 A1 20041229; EP 1491619 B1 20050105; AT 286531 T 20050115; DE 60300259 D1 20050210; DE 60300259 T2 20051215; DK 1491619 T3 20050517; EP 1586630 A1 20051019; ES 2238657 T3 20050901; PT 1491619 E 20050531; SI 1491619 T1 20050630

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-07-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120901

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120901

2013-07-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60300259

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-05-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120901

2013-05-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 286531 T

- Effective date: 20120901

2013-01-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100902

2012-09-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2011-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100902

2011-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110826

- Year of fee payment: 9

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110831

- Year of fee payment: 9

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110824

- Year of fee payment: 9

2011-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-10-19 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111019

2011-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2011-07-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110404

2011-06-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-06-22 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2011-05-31 [PG25 RO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2011-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-05-30 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2011-05-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-04-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-04-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *JP LABORATORIES PVT. LTD

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-03-09 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2010-11-30 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2010-05-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20090819

- Year of fee payment: 7

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091012

- Year of fee payment: 7

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090912

- Year of fee payment: 7

2010-02-26 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090917

- Year of fee payment: 7

2010-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20091006

- Year of fee payment: 7

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20091006

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-11-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20090929

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090903

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20090901

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-11-30 [PGFP RO] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Payment date: 20090812

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090910

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-11-30 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20090806

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-10-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2009-10-30 [PG25 HU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080902

2009-10-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20090914

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-10-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20090914

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-09-30 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2009-07-31 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-07-31 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080902

2009-06-30 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20090420

2009-06-15 [REG EE MM4A] LAPSED BY NOT PAYING THE ANNUAL FEES

- Document: EE E000100

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-05-29 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2009-05-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2009-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-04-27 [LTLA] LT: LAPSE OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20080901

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: J.P. LABORATORIES PVT.LTD.

- Free text: J.P. LABORATORIES PVT.LTD.#A-76 MIDC, KURKUMBH, DAUND#PUNE 413801 (IN) -TRANSFER TO- J.P. LABORATORIES PVT.LTD.#A-76 MIDC, KURKUMBH, DAUND#PUNE 413801 (IN)

2008-01-31 [PGFP BG] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Payment date: 20070910

- Year of fee payment: 5

2008-01-31 [PGFP EE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Payment date: 20070807

- Year of fee payment: 5

2008-01-31 [PGFP SI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Payment date: 20070903

- Year of fee payment: 5

2008-01-02 [PGFP CZ] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Payment date: 20070822

- Year of fee payment: 5

2007-11-24 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20070814

- Year of fee payment: 5

2007-11-24 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20070912

- Year of fee payment: 5

2007-11-24 [PGFP SK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Payment date: 20070822

- Year of fee payment: 5

2007-09-06 [PGFP HU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Payment date: 20070906

- Year of fee payment: 5

2007-08-28 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20070828

- Year of fee payment: 5

2006-03-07 [REG RO EPE] EP PATENT VALID IN ROMANIA

2006-01-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051006

2005-11-11 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1073128

2005-10-17 [REG EE HB1A] CORRECTION OF OWNER NAME OR ADDRESS

- Document: EE E000100

2005-09-23 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1073128

2005-09-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-09-21 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20040924

- Countries: AL

2005-09-21 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20040924

- Countries: LT

2005-09-21 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20040924

- Countries: LV

2005-09-21 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20040924

- Countries: MK

2005-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2238657 T3

2005-08-15 [REG EE FG4A] TRANSLATION OF THE SPECIFICATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT VALID IN ESTONIA

- Document: EE E000100

- Effective date: 20050405

2005-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2005-05-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-05-18 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20050401104

2005-05-17 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-04-12 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60300259 P 20050210

2005-02-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK

2005-01-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-12-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040330

2004-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK