Global Patent Index - EP 1491711 A1

EP 1491711 A1 2004-12-29 - Roller shutter box

Title (en)

Roller shutter box

Title (de)

Rolladenkasten

Title (fr)

Boîte pour volet roulant

Publication

EP 1491711 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 04102345 A

Priority

  • DE 10328725 A
  • DE 10347717 A

Abstract (en)

A box (1) for a roller blind consists of a hard foamed plastic. The side walls (3) contain vertically arranged stabilizing sheet metal (4) composed of steel and/or a tightly meshed construction steel (15,16). The box consists of polystyrol. The sheet metal is 0.3-1.0mm , especially 0.5-0.6mm thick, and is profiled in a direction parallel to the box slit shaped opening. The stabilizing sheet metal has lateral stabilizers (10).

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft einen Rolladenkasten (1) aus Kunststoffhartschaum. Um einen Rolladenkasten zur Verfügung zu stellen, der eine ausreichende Festigkeit und Biegesteifigkeit aufweist, so daß er in Längen über 1,5 m gefertigt werden kann, ohne daß beim Einbau ein zusätzliches Abstützen in der Mitte notwendig ist, wird erfindungsgemäß vorgeschlagen, daß er mindestens ein vertikal angeordnetes Stabilisierungsblech (4) aus Stahlblech und/oder ein engmaschiges Baustahlgewebe in den Seitenwänden (3) aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/17

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/17 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/17007 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT PL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1491711 A1 20041229

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20101201

2010-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100721

2005-09-21 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT PL

2005-03-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050108

2004-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK