Global Patent Index - EP 1491728 A2

EP 1491728 A2 2004-12-29 - Variable valve timing control device

Title (en)

Variable valve timing control device

Title (de)

Nockenwellenversteller

Title (fr)

Déphaseur d'arbre à cames

Publication

EP 1491728 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 04014612 A

Priority

JP 2003181475 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a rotor component (2) assembled to a housing component (3). A stopper is formed on a convex portion to define a relative rotation between the components. A receiving hole (22) restricts the rotation by a lock plate (80). The plate is in contact with an inner peripheral face of the hole on advanced and retarded angle sides between opening and bottom portions (22a, 22d) of the hole when the rotation is restricted.

A variable valve timing control device (1) includes a housing member (3), a rotor member (2) assembled to the housing member so as to be rotatable relative thereto and including vane portions (70) each forming an advanced angle chamber (R1) and a retarded angle chamber (R2) within the housing member (3), a stopper (33a,33b) formed on the convex portion for defining a relative rotation between the housing member (3) and the rotor member (2), a lock mechanism (22,88) for restricting the relative rotation by a lock member (80), and a fluid pressure circuit for controlling an operation oil to be supplied to or discharged from the advanced angle chamber (R1), the retarded angle chamber (R2), and the lock mechanism (22,80). When the relative rotation is restricted, the lock member (80) is in contact with an inner peripheral face of the receiving hole (22) on the advanced angle side and the retarded angle side between an opening portion (22a) and a bottom portion (22b) of the receiving hole (22). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 1/344

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/344 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/3442 (2013.01); F01L 2001/34453 (2013.01); F01L 2001/34483 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1491728 A2 20041229; EP 1491728 A3 20051130; EP 1491728 B1 20100811; DE 602004028552 D1 20100923; US 2005022763 A1 20050203

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20180103

2018-01-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 602004028552

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160614

- Year of fee payment: 13

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150622

2016-04-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150622

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140609

- Year of fee payment: 11

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140618

- Year of fee payment: 11

2014-04-30 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 602004028552

- Effective date: 20140218

2014-03-12 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20140219

2011-09-08 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602004028552

- Effective date: 20110512

2011-07-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110512

2010-09-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602004028552 P 20100923

2010-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2010-08-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080414

2006-08-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060126

2005-11-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-11-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK

2004-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK