EP 1491767 A4 20060118 - SEALED TYPE COMPRESSOR
Title (en)
SEALED TYPE COMPRESSOR
Title (de)
HERMETISCH GESCHLOSSENER VERDICHTER
Title (fr)
COMPRESSEUR DE TYPE ETANCHE
Publication
Application
Priority
- JP 2004001608 W 20040216
- JP 2003088467 A 20030327
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP1491767A1] A suction muffler (110) is connected to the cylinder head (123) of a cylinder disposed within the sealed vessel which comprises the compressor. A seal section consisting of a flange (118) disposed on the suction muffler and a groove (129) formed in the cylinder head, isolate a resonance chamber (128) from the interior of the sealed vessel to arrest the suction pressure pulsation from leaking into the sealed vessel.
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
F04B 27/02 (2006.01); F04B 39/00 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
F04B 39/0061 (2013.01 - EP US); F04B 39/0072 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [Y] US 4759693 A 19880726 - OUTZEN SVEND E [DK]
- [A] US 5950307 A 19990914 - LEE SUNG-TAE [KR]
- [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2002, no. 12 12 December 2002 (2002-12-12)
- [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 18 5 June 2001 (2001-06-05)
- [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 13 5 February 2001 (2001-02-05)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 06 30 April 1998 (1998-04-30)
- See references of WO 2004085849A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1491767 A1 20041229; EP 1491767 A4 20060118; EP 1491767 B1 20070418; BR PI0403929 A 20050104; CN 100400869 C 20080709; CN 1697931 A 20051116; DE 602004005923 D1 20070531; DE 602004005923 T2 20080117; JP 2004293464 A 20041021; JP 4492032 B2 20100630; MX PA04009433 A 20050125; US 2005207920 A1 20050922; WO 2004085849 A1 20041007
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 04711475 A 20040216; BR PI0403929 A 20040216; CN 200480000099 A 20040216; DE 602004005923 T 20040216; JP 2003088467 A 20030327; JP 2004001608 W 20040216; MX PA04009433 A 20040216; US 50974804 A 20040930