Global Patent Index - EP 1491828 A1

EP 1491828 A1 2004-12-29 - Panel radiator

Title (en)

Panel radiator

Title (de)

Flachheizkörper

Title (fr)

Radiateur à panneau

Publication

EP 1491828 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 04090148 A

Priority

DE 20309867 U

Abstract (en)

The threaded connectors (1,2,3,4) provide a connection (1) for the integrated valve (5) and outlet for the hot water (3) or (4), the other being plugged. The inlet connection (2) has a tube (6) joining the inlet to the valve.

Abstract (de)

Heizkörper, insbesondere Flachheizkörper mit seitlichen Gewindemuffen (1, 2, 3, 4) und mit integriertem Ventil (5), wobei zwischen den oberen Gewindemuffen (1, 2) ein Verbindungsrohr (6) angeordnet ist, wobei die dem Ventilsitz (5) jeweils gegenüberliegende Gewindemuffe für den Anschluss an den Heizmediumvorlauf (VL) vorgesehen ist und den Heizmediumvorlauf (VL) nur in das zum Ventil (5) verlaufende Verbindungsrohr (6) ermöglicht, wobei die Bauhöhe des Heizkörpers dem Nabenabstand (NAR) eines Radiators entspricht.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 9/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24D 19/0012 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20309867 U1 20031002; EP 1491828 A1 20041229

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-12 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20070802

2007-04-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070326

2005-09-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-05-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050324

2004-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK