Global Patent Index - EP 1492065 A2

EP 1492065 A2 2004-12-29 - Gaming machine with bonus game feature

Title (en)

Gaming machine with bonus game feature

Title (de)

Spielautomat mit Bonusspiel

Title (fr)

Machine à sous avec jeu à bonus

Publication

EP 1492065 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 04014466 A

Priority

JP 2003180065 A

Abstract (en)

The machine includes a CPU controlling another CPU to execute a bonus game if a continuation condition concerning with another bonus game is realized. The former CPU controls the latter CPU to execute the former bonus game if a predetermined condition concerned with a third game executed by a third CPU is realized. The former bonus game has a higher payout than that of the latter bonus game.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 17/32; G07F 17/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63F 5/04 (2006.01); G07F 17/32 (2006.01); G07F 17/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/3211 (2013.01); G07F 17/3244 (2013.01); G07F 17/3267 (2013.01); G07F 17/34 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1492065 A2 20041229; EP 1492065 A3 20051005; AU 2004202718 A1 20050120; AU 2004202718 B2 20091203; CN 1320934 C 20070613; CN 1572347 A 20050202; JP 2005013356 A 20050120; US 2004266510 A1 20041230; ZA 200404889 B 20050426

INPADOC legal status


2014-06-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140103

2011-08-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: UNIVERSAL ENTERTAINMENT CORPORATION

2006-06-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-10-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-10-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK

2004-12-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040621

2004-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK