Global Patent Index - EP 1492683 B8

EP 1492683 B8 2007-10-17 - FUEL TRANSPORT UNIT FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE

Title (en)

FUEL TRANSPORT UNIT FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE

Title (de)

KRAFTSTOFFFÖRDEREINHEIT FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG

Title (fr)

UNITE DE REFOULEMENT DE CARBURANT POUR AUTOMOBILE

Publication

EP 1492683 B8 (DE)

Application

EP 03729813 A

Priority

  • DE 0300955 W
  • DE 10215652 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO03084775A2] The invention relates to a fuel transport unit (2) for a motor vehicle. According to the invention, a pressure control valve (11) mounted in a fuel line of a sucking jet pump (5) is arranged inside a baffle pot (3) of a fuel tank (1). In this way, excess fuel arrives directly in the baffle pot (3) via an outlet (12) of the pressure control valve (11), thus avoiding unnecessary circulation of the fuel in the fuel tank (1).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60K 15/10 (2006.01); B60K 15/077 (2006.01); F02M 37/00 (2006.01); F02M 37/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/0029 (2013.01); B60K 15/077 (2013.01); F02M 37/025 (2013.01); B60K 2015/03118 (2013.01); F02M 37/0052 (2013.01); F02M 37/0094 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 03084775 A2 20031016; WO 03084775 A3 20040212; DE 10215652 A1 20031106; DE 50307885 D1 20070920; EP 1492683 A2 20050105; EP 1492683 B1 20070808; EP 1492683 B8 20071017; ES 2289294 T3 20080201; US 2003226548 A1 20031211

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170331

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-12-09 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20111104

2011-12-09 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20111104

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100322

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110404

2011-04-15 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110415

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100321

2010-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100321

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090325

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090324

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-07-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080509

2008-03-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VDO AUTOMOTIVE AG

2008-03-07 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2289294 T3

2007-12-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20071128

2007-12-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-09-26 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SIEMENS VDO AUTOMOTIVE AG

2007-09-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50307885 P 20070920

2007-08-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2007-08-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-04-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050222

2005-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040920

2005-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR