Global Patent Index - EP 1497314 A4

EP 1497314 A4 2007-10-10 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF USE OF TARGETING PEPTIDES AGAINST PLACENTA AND ADIPOSE TISSUES

Title (en)

COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF USE OF TARGETING PEPTIDES AGAINST PLACENTA AND ADIPOSE TISSUES

Title (de)

AUF PEPTIDE GEGEN PLAZENTA- UND FETTGEWEBE ABZIELENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS ET PROCEDES D'UTILISATION DE PEPTIDES DE CIBLAGE CONTRE LES TISSUS ADIPEUX ET PLACENTAIRES

Publication

EP 1497314 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 02757531 A

Priority

  • US 0227836 W
  • US 0127692 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO03022991A2] The present invention concerns compositions comprising and methods of identification and use of targeting peptides for placenta or adipose tissue. In certain embodiments, the targeting peptides comprise part or all of SEQ ID NO:5-11, SEQ ID NO:13-22 OR SEQ ID NO:144. The peptides may be attached to various therapeutic agents for targeted delivery. Adipose-targeting peptides may be used in methods for weight control, inducing weight loss and treating lipodystrophy syndrome. Adipose-targeting may also be accomplished using other binding moieties selectively targeted to adipose receptors, such as a prohibitin receptor protein complex. Placenta-targeting peptides may be used to interfere with pregnancy, induce labor and/or for targeted delivery of therapeutic agents to placenta and/or fetus. In other embodiments, receptors identified by binding to placenta-targeting peptides may be used to screen compounds for potential teratogenicity. An exemplary placental receptor is FcRn/ beta 2M, and compounds that bind to FcRn/ beta 2M are potential teratogens.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 5/00; A61K 38/08; A61K 38/10; A61K 48/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 47/48 (2006.01); C07K 7/06 (2006.01); C07K 7/28 (2006.01); C12N 15/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 7/28 (2013.01); A61K 47/64 (2017.08); C07K 7/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 0142276 A1 20010614 - PROTEOM LTD [GB], et al
  • [A] WO 9839469 A1 19980911 - BIO TECHNOLOGY GENERAL CORP [US], et al
  • [A] WO 9904813 A1 19990204 - BRIGHAM & WOMENS HOSPITAL [US], et al
  • [A] WO 0153342 A1 20010726 - BURNHAM INST [US], et al
  • [PX] WO 0220769 A1 20020314 - UNIV TEXAS [US], et al
  • [X] WO 0113114 A1 20010222 - BIO RAD PASTEUR [FR], et al
  • [X] US 5622699 A 19970422 - RUOSLAHTI ERKKI [US], et al
  • [X] ST HILAIRE P M ET AL: "The substrate specificity of a recombinant cysteine protease from Leishmania mexicana: application of a combinatorial peptide library approach.", CHEMBIOCHEM : A EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL BIOLOGY 18 AUG 2000, vol. 1, no. 2, 18 August 2000 (2000-08-18), pages 115 - 122, XP002433167, ISSN: 1439-4227
  • [A] KOLONIN MIKHAIL GERMAN ET AL: "Targeting physiological and pathological blood vessel formation with in vivo phage display", PROCEEDINGS OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH ANNUAL MEETING, vol. 42, March 2001 (2001-03-01), & 92ND ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH; NEW ORLEANS, LA, USA; MARCH 24-28, 2001, pages 822 - 823, XP001536410, ISSN: 0197-016X
  • [T] KOLONIN MIKHAIL G ET AL: "Teratogenicity induced by targeting a placental immunoglobulin transporter", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, vol. 99, no. 20, 1 October 2002 (2002-10-01), pages 13055 - 13060, XP002433168, ISSN: 0027-8424
  • [X] HUSSAIN MUNIR A ET AL: "Nasal mucosal metabolism and absorption of pentapeptide enkephalin analogs having varying N-terminal amino acids", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, vol. 84, no. 1, 1995, pages 62 - 64, XP002447983, ISSN: 0022-3549
  • [X] NOMIZU ET AL.: "Cell binding sequences in mouse laminin alpha1 chain", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 273, no. 46, 1998, pages 32491 - 32499, XP002447984
  • [T] KOLONIN M G ET AL: "Reversal of obesity by targeted ablation of adipose tissue", NATURE MEDICINE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 10, no. 6, June 2004 (2004-06-01), pages 625 - 632, XP002363820, ISSN: 1078-8956
  • See also references of WO 03022991A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 03022991 A2 20030320; WO 03022991 A3 20041028; AU 2002323543 A1 20030324; CA 2458047 A1 20030320; EP 1497314 A2 20050119; EP 1497314 A4 20071010

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090428

2008-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080327

2007-10-10 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20070912

2005-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040406

2005-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2005-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI