Global Patent Index - EP 1497587 B1

EP 1497587 B1 2007-10-17 - PRESSURISED CONTAINER FOR STORING GASEOUS MEDIA UNDER PRESSURE

Title (en)

PRESSURISED CONTAINER FOR STORING GASEOUS MEDIA UNDER PRESSURE

Title (de)

DRUCKBEHÄLTER ZUR SPEICHERUNG VON GASFÖRMIGEN MEDIEN UNTER DRUCK

Title (fr)

RESERVOIR SOUS PRESSION CON U POUR STOCKER DES SUBSTANCES GAZEUSES SOUS PRESSION

Publication

EP 1497587 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 03722277 A

Priority

  • DE 0301223 W
  • DE 10218941 A
  • DE 10313146 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO03089836A1] The invention relates to a pressurised container for storing gaseous media under pressure. Said container consists of a longitudinally welded pipe, which is sealed at both ends and comprises a filling and evacuation opening at least at one end. According to the invention, the longitudinally welded pipe (1, 2), produced according to the UOE process, has a diameter >/= 508 mm and a minimum yield stress >/= X 70. The open ends of said pipe are connected to and sealed by dome-shaped dish parts (4, 5). The pressurised container that is produced in this manner is designed for a minimum filling pressure of 200 bar at ambient temperature. One dish part (5) is provided with the filling and evacuation opening. The longitudinal weld seam (1, 2) and all other joint weld seams (3, 6, 7) of the pipe are configured with the highest possible fatigue limit with reference to high load amplitudes.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F17C 1/00 (2006.01); F16J 12/00 (2006.01); F17C 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F17C 1/002 (2013.01); F17C 1/00 (2013.01); F17C 2201/0109 (2013.01); F17C 2201/035 (2013.01); F17C 2201/056 (2013.01); F17C 2201/058 (2013.01); F17C 2203/0617 (2013.01); F17C 2209/221 (2013.01); F17C 2221/00 (2013.01); F17C 2223/0123 (2013.01); F17C 2223/036 (2013.01); F17C 2223/047 (2013.01); F17C 2260/011 (2013.01); F17C 2260/012 (2013.01); F17C 2260/053 (2013.01); F17C 2270/0105 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FI GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 03089836 A1 20031030; AU 2003229519 A1 20031103; CA 2480721 A1 20031030; CA 2480721 C 20080617; CN 100554758 C 20091028; CN 1646850 A 20050727; DE 50308412 D1 20071129; EP 1497587 A1 20050119; EP 1497587 B1 20071017; ES 2291631 T3 20080301; JP 2005526935 A 20050908; JP 4549682 B2 20100922

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150410

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-05-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160527

2016-01-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150409

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150409

2015-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150409

2014-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140428

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-08-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20140411

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140422

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080718

2008-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2291631 T3

2007-12-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20071128

2007-11-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50308412 P 20071129

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI GB

2007-10-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-09-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EUROPIPE GMBH

2005-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040831

2005-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK