Global Patent Index - EP 1499160 A3

EP 1499160 A3 2007-10-03 - Directional hearing aid

Title (en)

Directional hearing aid

Title (de)

Richthörhilfegerät

Title (fr)

Prothèse auditive directionnelle

Publication

EP 1499160 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 04014532 A

Priority

DE 10331956 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1499160A2] The device has a microphone system, a signal processing unit (11) and an output converter (12) for outputting an output signal. The microphone system has at least one first (1) and second (2) omnidirectional microphone wired to form a unit with a directional characteristic. At least one microphone can be delayed to vary the directional characteristic and the delay can be varied depending on the signal level of the acoustic input signal. An independent claim is also included for the following: (a) a method of operating an inventive hearing aid .

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/407 (2013.01); H04R 25/405 (2013.01); H04R 2225/41 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL HR LT LV MK

EPO simple patent family

EP 1499160 A2 20050119; EP 1499160 A3 20071003; AU 2004203135 A1 20050203; AU 2004203135 B2 20070308; DE 10331956 B3 20050127; DE 10331956 C5 20101118; US 2005041824 A1 20050224; US 7209568 B2 20070424

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20150130

2014-10-15 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20140919

2010-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100419

2008-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080403

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK

2005-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK