Global Patent Index - EP 1500879 B1

EP 1500879 B1 2009-02-25 - Glow plug with integral pressure sensing

Title (en)

Glow plug with integral pressure sensing

Title (de)

Glühstiftkerze mit integrierter Druckmessung

Title (fr)

Bougie à incandescence avec une détection intégrale de pression

Publication

EP 1500879 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 04014414 A

Priority

DE 10332960 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1500879A1] The diesel engine glow plug has an integral pressure sensor (16) that has a pressure channel (D) connecting it to the combustion chamber. The pressure channel comprises a groove (13) in the inner wall of the plug housing (4) in the combustion chamber section (8) of the glow plug. The groove extends from the combustion chamber to the pressure sensor in the glow plug body.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23Q 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23Q 7/001 (2013.01); F02P 19/028 (2013.01); F23Q 2007/002 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1500879 A1 20050126; EP 1500879 B1 20090225; DE 10332960 A1 20050210; DE 502004009036 D1 20090409

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170809

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150619

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140625

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110630

2012-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110630

2012-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100624

- Year of fee payment: 7

2010-02-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091126

2009-04-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502004009036 P 20090409

2009-02-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2005-10-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2005-09-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050726

2005-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK