EP 1502965 A1 20050202 - Free cutting brass alloy
Title (en)
Free cutting brass alloy
Title (de)
Messing mit guter Zerspanbarkeit.
Title (fr)
Laiton à usinage facile.
Publication
Application
Priority
CZ 20032094 A 20030801
Abstract (en)
The free cutting brass alloy on the basis of alloy Cu-Zn-Bi is designed primarily for hot and cold moulding, especially for manufacturing rods by cold drawing, and contains 55,0 % to 75,0 % by weight of copper, 0,5 % to 4,0 % by weight of bismuth, zinc residue and incidental tramp elements and impurities, such as 0,001 to 0,2 % by weight of lead and/or 0,001 to 0,3 % by weight of phosphor, 0,001 to 3,0 % by weight of silicon, 0,001 % to 2,0 % by weight of tin, a max. of 0,1 % by weight of aluminum, a max. of 0,4 % by weight of iron, a max. of 0,3 % by weight of nickel and a max. of 0,5 % by weight of other tramp elements on the whole.
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
C22C 9/04 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
C22C 9/04 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [X] EP 0457478 A1 19911121 - AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]
- [X] US 5637160 A 19970610 - BROCK ANDREW J [US], et al
- [Y] EP 1038981 A1 20000927 - SAMBO COPPER ALLOY CO LTD [JP]
- [XY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 20 10 July 2001 (2001-07-10)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 03 29 March 1996 (1996-03-29)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2002, no. 05 3 May 2002 (2002-05-03)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2002, no. 05 3 May 2002 (2002-05-03)
- [XP] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2003, no. 12 5 December 2003 (2003-12-05)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1502965 A1 20050202; CZ 20032094 A3 20050413; CZ 294891 B6 20050413
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 04466021 A 20040729; CZ 20032094 A 20030801