Global Patent Index - EP 1505570 B1

EP 1505570 B1 2017-10-11 - Singing voice synthesizing method

Title (en)

Singing voice synthesizing method

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Synthese einer Singstimme

Title (fr)

Méthode de synthèse de voix chantée

Publication

EP 1505570 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 03017548 A

Priority

EP 03017548 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1505570A1] A frequency spectrum is detected by analyzing a frequency of a voice waveform corresponding to a voice synthesis unit formed of a phoneme or a phonemic chain. Local peaks are detected on the frequency spectrum, and spectrum distribution regions including the local peaks are designated. For each spectrum distribution region, amplitude spectrum data representing an amplitude spectrum distribution depending on a frequency axis and phase spectrum data representing a phase spectrum distribution depending on the frequency axis are generated. The amplitude spectrum data is adjusted to move the amplitude spectrum distribution represented by the amplitude spectrum data along the frequency axis based on an input note pitch, and the phase spectrum data is adjusted corresponding to the adjustment. Spectrum intensities are adjusted to be along with a spectrum envelope corresponding to a desired tone color. The adjusted amplitude and phase spectrum data are converted into a synthesized voice signal.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 13/033 (2013.01); G10L 21/0232 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 13/033 (2013.01); G10L 21/0232 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

DOLSON M: "THE PHASE VOCODER: A TUTORIAL", COMPUTER MUSIC JOURNAL, CAMBRIDGE, MA, US, vol. 10, no. 4, 21 December 1986 (1986-12-21), pages 14 - 27, XP009029676, ISSN: 0148-9267

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1505570 A1 20050209; EP 1505570 B1 20171011

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-23 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 60350676

2017-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2017-10-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2017-04-19 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170324

2017-04-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G10L 13/033 20130101AFI20170307BHEP

2017-04-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G10L 21/0232 20130101ALN20170307BHEP

2017-03-07 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 60350676

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: G10L0013020000

- IPC: G10L0013033000

2012-05-09 [R17C] DATE OF DESPATCH OF FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090109

2009-02-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090109

2007-07-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: YAMAHA CORPORATION

2005-10-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2005-10-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050808

2005-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK