EP 1507031 A1 20050216 - Heating apparatus of washing machine and control method thereof
Title (en)
Heating apparatus of washing machine and control method thereof
Title (de)
Heizvorrichtung für Waschmaschine und Steuerverfahren dafür
Title (fr)
Appareil de chauffage pour une machine à laver et méthode pour le commander
Publication
Application
Priority
KR 20030056267 A 20030813
Abstract (en)
A heating apparatus of a washing machine comprises: a steam generator for generating steam; and a spray nozzle for spraying steam generated from the steam generator into a tub, in which a water level sensor for detecting a level of water supplied for steam generation step by step is mounted at the steam generator. According to this, an entire size of the washing machine is reduced, an amount of washing water is reduced, and a water level inside the steam generator is detected more accurately, thereby enhancing a performance of the heating apparatus. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
D06F 33/02 (2006.01); D06F 35/00 (2006.01); D06F 39/04 (2006.01); D06F 39/08 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
D06F 39/40 (2024.01 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [Y] DE 3627988 A1 19870423 - TECH MIKROELEKTRONIK FORSCH [DD]
- [Y] EP 0877200 A1 19981111 - IMETEC SPA [IT]
- [A] EP 0816550 A1 19980107 - ESSWEIN SA [FR]
- [A] US 2003010117 A1 20030116 - SHON JONG-CHULL [KR]
- [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2003, no. 05 12 May 2003 (2003-05-12)
- [PY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2003, no. 12 5 December 2003 (2003-12-05)
- [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 06 30 June 1997 (1997-06-30)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2003, no. 08 6 August 2003 (2003-08-06)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 449 (C - 0986) 18 September 1992 (1992-09-18)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
DE FR GB
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1507031 A1 20050216; EP 1507031 B1 20090722; CN 100387769 C 20080514; CN 1580369 A 20050216; DE 602004022113 D1 20090903; KR 100500887 B1 20050714; KR 20050017489 A 20050222; US 2005034250 A1 20050217
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 04002018 A 20040130; CN 200410003539 A 20040129; DE 602004022113 T 20040130; KR 20030056267 A 20030813; US 75343004 A 20040109