EP 1507052 A1 20050216 - Force transfer element
Title (en)
Force transfer element
Title (de)
Krafteinleitungselement
Title (fr)
Elément de transfert de force
Publication
Application
Priority
EP 03018366 A 20030813
Abstract (en)
The compound material strip (5) has in the region of the force transfer at least one recess (6) so that a tie element (4) can be passed through the recess. At least one contact pressure plate (3) is pressed against the compound material through the tie element. The tie element is preferably a bolt or screw. Independent claim describes method for attaching power flow element to support structure where a recess is provided on the compound material strip and a contact pressure plate is placed against same.
Abstract (de)
Bei einem Krafteinleitungselement (1) zur Verankerung eines bandförmigen Verbundwerkstoffs (5) an einer Tragstruktur (10), erfolgt eine Kraftübertragung von der Tragstruktur (10) auf den Verbundwerkstoff (5) im wesentlichen mittels mindestens einer Anpressplatte (3). Im Verbundwerkstoff (5) im Bereich der Kraftübertragung ist mindestens eine Aussparung (6) angeordnet. Mindestens ein Zugelement (4) ist durch die Aussparung (6) im Verbundwerkstoff (5) hindurchgeführt, die mindestens eine Anpressplatte (3) ist mittels dem mindest einen Zugelement (4) an den Verbundwerkstoff (5) angepresst. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
E04C 5/12 (2006.01); E04G 23/02 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
E04C 5/127 (2013.01); E04G 23/0218 (2013.01); E04G 2023/0251 (2013.01); E04G 2023/0255 (2013.01); E04G 2023/0259 (2013.01)
Citation (applicant)
- WO 9910613 A1 19990304 - STRESSHEAD AG [CH], et al
- WO 9621785 A1 19960718 - EMPA [CH], et al
Citation (search report)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 0170, no. 88 (M - 1370) 22 February 1993 (1993-02-22)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2003, no. 04 2 April 2003 (2003-04-02)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 12 29 October 1999 (1999-10-29)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 0185, no. 48 (M - 1689) 19 October 1994 (1994-10-19)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 03018366 A 20030813