EP 1508625 A1 20050223 - Copper alloy having excellent corrosion cracking resistance and dezincing resistance, and method for producing same
Title (en)
Copper alloy having excellent corrosion cracking resistance and dezincing resistance, and method for producing same
Title (de)
Kupferlegierung, die exzellente Korrosionsbeständigkeit und Entzinkungsbeständigkeit aufweist, und eine Methode zu deren Herstellung
Title (fr)
Alliage de cuivre, qui a une excellente résistance à la corrosion et au dézincage, et procédure de fabrication
Publication
Application
Priority
EP 03018581 A 20030818
Abstract (en)
A copper alloy having an excellent corrosion cracking resistance and an excellent dezincing resistance consists of: 58 to 66 wt% of copper (Cu); 0.1 to 0.8 wt% of Sn; 0.01 to 0.5 wt% of Si; at least one of 0.3 to 3.5 wt% of lead (Pb) , 0.3 to 3.0 wt% of bismuth (Bi) , 0.02 to 0.15 wt% of phosphorus (P), 0.02 to 3.0 wt% of nickel (Ni) and 0.02 to 0.6 wt% of iron (Fe) if necessary; and the balance being zinc (Zn) and unavoidable impurities, wherein the proportion of an alpha phase is 80 vol% or more. The apparent content of zinc (Zn) in the copper alloy is in the range of from 34 to 39 wt%.
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
CPC (source: EP)
Citation (search report)
- [X] EP 1008664 A1 20000614 - KITZ CORP [JP]
- [A] US 5445687 A 19950829 - SUKEGAWA TOSUKE [JP], et al
- [A] EP 0663452 A2 19950719 - KITZ CORP [JP]
- [A] US 4294629 A 19811013 - SZYSZKOWSKI ADAM, et al
- [A] US 6599378 B1 20030729 - HAGIWARA KOICHI [JP], et al
- [X] "Copper and Copper Alloys", 2001, ASM INTERNATIONAL, MATERIALS PARK, OHIO, USA, XP002264346
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2002, no. 02 2 April 2002 (2002-04-02)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 07 31 August 1995 (1995-08-31)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 008, no. 019 (C - 207) 26 January 1984 (1984-01-26)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1508625 A1 20050223; EP 1508625 B1 20070214; AT E353981 T1 20070315; DE 60311803 D1 20070329; DE 60311803 T2 20071031
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 03018581 A 20030818; AT 03018581 T 20030818; DE 60311803 T 20030818