Global Patent Index - EP 1510048 B8

EP 1510048 B8 2009-02-18 - MANAGING A COMMUNICATION DEVICE VIA A GPRS AND A GSM CONNECTION

Title (en)

MANAGING A COMMUNICATION DEVICE VIA A GPRS AND A GSM CONNECTION

Title (de)

VERWALTUNG EINER KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG ÜBER EINE GPRS UND EINE GSM VERBINDUNG

Title (fr)

GESTION D'UN DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION PAR CONNEXION GPRS ET GSM

Publication

EP 1510048 B8 (EN)

Application

EP 03727904 A

Priority

  • EP 03727904 A
  • EP 02291389 A
  • IB 0302437 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1370031A1] A Method of managing a communication device (MP) being arranged to communicate with a server (SERV) via a first communication network (GSMNET) and a second communication network (IPNET) is characterised in that the method comprises the following step: an instruction step, in which the server (SERV) sends a management-request instruction to the communication device (MP) via the first communication network and; an executing step, in which the communication device (MP) executes the management-request instruction which causes the communication device (MP) to request the server (SERV) to effect an operation in the communication device (MP) via the second communication network (IPNET). <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 12/24 (2006.01); H04L 12/28 (2006.01); H04L 12/54 (2013.01); H04L 29/06 (2006.01); H04L 29/08 (2006.01); H04W 92/02 (2009.01); H04W 84/04 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 12/5692 (2013.01); H04L 29/06 (2013.01); H04L 67/04 (2013.01); H04L 67/14 (2013.01); H04L 67/34 (2013.01); H04W 76/12 (2018.02); H04W 92/02 (2013.01); H04L 67/42 (2013.01); H04L 69/329 (2013.01); H04W 84/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1370031 A1 20031210; AT 414365 T 20081115; AU 2003233150 A1 20031222; AU 2003233150 A8 20031222; CN 100555978 C 20091028; CN 1669278 A 20050914; DE 60324673 D1 20081224; DK 1510048 T3 20090316; EP 1510048 A2 20050302; EP 1510048 B1 20081112; EP 1510048 B8 20090218; EP 2040424 A1 20090325; EP 2040424 B1 20140730; ES 2316754 T3 20090416; ES 2527283 T3 20150122; JP 2005529550 A 20050929; JP 4778708 B2 20110921; US 2005223105 A1 20051006; US 7493128 B2 20090217; WO 03105419 A2 20031218; WO 03105419 A3 20040226

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180523

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180528

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180525

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-08-31 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20180529

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20180525

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180522

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-07-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20180524

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20180522

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180528

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-05-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170703

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170526

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170526

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-05-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-09-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081112

2011-06-30 [PG25 HU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090513

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090604

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090213

2010-01-29 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2009-10-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090813

2009-09-30 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081112

2009-08-31 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081112

2009-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090413

2009-07-31 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090212

2009-07-31 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081112

2009-07-31 [PG25 RO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081112

2009-05-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081112

2009-05-29 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081112

2009-04-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081112

2009-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2316754 T3

2009-03-16 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2009-01-27 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2008-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BUGNION S.A.

2008-12-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60324673 P 20081224

2008-12-10 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2008-12-10 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: GEMALTO SA

2008-12-10 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SCHLUMBERGER MALCO, INC.

2008-11-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-11-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-10-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AXALTO S.A.

2008-10-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHLUMBERGER MALCO, INC.

2007-03-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050323

2005-09-28 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2005-05-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050323

2005-03-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041217

2005-03-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-03-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK