Global Patent Index - EP 1510290 B1

EP 1510290 B1 2007-10-10 - Eyeglass lens processing apparatus

Title (en)

Eyeglass lens processing apparatus

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Bearbeiten von Brillengläsern

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le traitement des verres à lunettes

Publication

EP 1510290 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 04020466 A

Priority

JP 2003307761 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1510290A1] An eyeglass lens processing apparatus (1) for processing a periphery of an eyeglass lens (LE) includes: lens rotating means including lens rotating shafts (110L, 110R) for holding the lens; first grinding means including a first grindstone rotating shaft (203) arranged with a first beveling grindstone for forming a bevel on the periphery of the lens; second grinding means including a second grindstone rotating shaft (260) arranged with a secondbeveling grindstone (271) having a smaller diameter than that of the first beveling grindstone, for forming a bevel on the periphery of the lens; and selecting means (420, 450) for selecting either of the first grinding means and the second grinding means when processing the bevel. <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 9/14 (2006.01); B24B 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 9/148 (2013.01); B24B 27/0076 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1510290 A1 20050302; EP 1510290 B1 20071010; DE 602004009374 D1 20071122; DE 602004009374 T2 20080710; ES 2294413 T3 20080401; JP 2005074560 A 20050324; JP 4131842 B2 20080813

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-14 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160712

- Year of fee payment: 13

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160824

- Year of fee payment: 13

2016-07-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130828

2014-09-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140908

2014-05-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 602004009374

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120827

- Year of fee payment: 9

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120822

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080711

2008-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2294413 T3

2008-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-11-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602004009374 P 20071122

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2007-10-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-11-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2005-09-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050726

2005-03-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-03-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK