Global Patent Index - EP 1510995 B1

EP 1510995 B1 2009-02-25 - Display apparatus

Title (en)

Display apparatus

Title (de)

Anzeigevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'affichage

Publication

EP 1510995 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 04103451 A

Priority

DE 10340028 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1510995A2] The device (1) has a display (4) switchable at least temporarily into a transparent state, at least over part of its area, to enable the observer (3) to observe the background (31) behind the display. The display has a first switchable filter at least over part of its area that can be switched between an essentially diffuse, at least partial transmission state and an essentially transparent, at least partial transmission state. An independent claim is also included for the following: (a) a method of operating an inventive device.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 9/35 (2006.01); G09F 13/08 (2006.01); G09F 19/12 (2006.01); G09F 21/04 (2006.01); G09F 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 13/08 (2013.01); G09F 9/35 (2013.01); G09F 19/12 (2013.01); G09F 21/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1510995 A2 20050302; EP 1510995 A3 20060329; EP 1510995 B1 20090225; DE 10340028 A1 20050407; DE 10340028 B4 20090709; DE 502004009037 D1 20090409

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170731

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-07-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-07-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090225

2010-02-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091126

2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090605

2009-04-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502004009037 P 20090409

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2008-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH

2006-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2006-11-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060928

2006-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK

2006-03-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G09F 9/35 20060101AFI20041223BHEP

2006-03-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G09F 13/08 20060101ALI20060207BHEP

2006-03-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G09F 19/12 20060101ALI20060207BHEP

2006-03-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G09F 21/04 20060101ALI20060207BHEP

2005-03-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-03-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK