EP 1512736 B1 20180502 - Stabilised diesel fuel additive compositions
Title (en)
Stabilised diesel fuel additive compositions
Title (de)
Stabilisierte Additivzusammensetzungen für Dieselkraftstoffe
Title (fr)
Compositions d'additifs stabilisées pour carburants diesel
Publication
Application
Priority
- EP 04255073 A 20040824
- EP 03255551 A 20030905
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP1512736A1] A diesel fuel composition containing metallic additives that are stabilised against phase separation. The diesel fuel contains a colloidally dispersed or solubilised metal catalyst compound, which can be used for diesel particulate trap regeneration and, as a stabiliser, 5-1,000 ppm (weight) of an oil-soluble or oil-dispersible organic compound having a lipophilic hydrocarbyl chain having attached directly thereto at least two contiguous polar head functional groups, i.e., the functional groups are separated by no more than three carbon atoms. The diesel fuel composition is particularly suitable for use with diesel engines fitted with a particulate trap for emissions control.
IPC 8 full level
C10L 1/10 (2006.01); C10L 1/12 (2006.01); C10L 1/18 (2006.01); C10L 1/188 (2006.01); C10L 1/19 (2006.01); C10L 1/196 (2006.01); C10L 1/198 (2006.01); C10L 1/224 (2006.01); C10L 1/236 (2006.01); C10L 10/06 (2006.01); C10L 10/18 (2006.01); C10L 1/22 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
C10L 1/10 (2013.01); C10L 1/1883 (2013.01); C10L 1/1905 (2013.01); C10L 1/191 (2013.01); C10L 1/1966 (2013.01); C10L 1/1985 (2013.01); C10L 1/224 (2013.01); C10L 1/2364 (2013.01); C10L 10/06 (2013.01); C10L 10/08 (2013.01); C10L 10/14 (2013.01); C10L 10/18 (2013.01); C10L 1/1233 (2013.01); C10L 1/1963 (2013.01)
Citation (opposition)
Opponent : Rhodia Operations
- FR 2097879 A5 19720303 - AVCO CORP
- WO 0200812 A2 20020103 - CELOX LTD [GB], et al
- WO 0110545 A1 20010215 - RHODIA TERRES RARES [FR], et al
- WO 03053560 A1 20030703 - RHODIA ELECT & CATALYSIS [FR], et al
- WO 8705924 A1 19871008 - REVERTEX LTD [GB]
- EP 1587898 A1 20051026 - OXONICA LTD [GB]
- WO 02092703 A1 20021121 - OXONICA LTD [GB], et al
- DOINA BICA: "PREPARATION OF MAGNETIC FLUIDS FOR VARIOUS APPLICATIONS", ROMANIAN REPORTS IN PHYSICS, vol. 47, no. 3-5, 1995, pages 265 - 272, XP055558574
- ANONYMOUS: "Using paraffin oil as a fuel", THE COMMERCIAL MOTOR ARCHIVE, 19 July 1921 (1921-07-19), XP055558586, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://archive.commercialmotor.com/article/19th-july-1921/16/-using-paraffin-oil-as-a-fuel>
- BARBELLA R; CIAJOLO A; D'ANNA A; BERTOLI C: "Effect of fuel aromaticity on diesel emissions", COMBUSTION AND FLAME, vol. 77, 1989, pages 267 - 277, XP023609843
- JEAN-MARC DI MEGLIO: "Colloides et nanosciences", TECHNIQUES DE L'LNGENIEUR RÉF.: J2130 V1, 10 September 2007 (2007-09-10), pages 1 - 12, XP055558628
Opponent : The Lubrizol Corporation
- WO 8705924 A1 19871008 - REVERTEX LTD [GB]
- CA 970553 A 19750708 - AVCO CORP
- WO 0200812 A2 20020103 - CELOX LTD [GB], et al
- US 3447918 A 19690603 - AMICK JAMES W
- US 3346354 A 19671010 - KAUTSKY GEORGE J, et al
- US 5919276 A 19990706 - JEFFREY GARETH CHARLES [GB]
- WO 03040270 A2 20030515 - OXONICA LTD [GB], et al
- WO 2004065529 A1 20040805 - OXONICA LTD [GB], et al
- WO 9744414 A1 19971127 - BP CHEMICALS ADDITIVES [GB], et al
- EP 0671205 A2 19950913 - RHONE POULENC CHIMIE [FR]
- WO 9936488 A1 19990722 - ASS OCTEL [GB], et al
- GB 2248068 A 19920325 - EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]
- US 4522631 A 19850611 - MOURAO ANTONIO M [US], et al
- US 5501714 A 19960326 - VALENTINE JAMES M [US], et al
- US 4775389 A 19881004 - SUNG RODNEY L [US], et al
- US 4778480 A 19881018 - MOURAO ANTONIO M [US], et al
- US 6023928 A 20000215 - PETER-HOBLYN JEREMY D [GB], et al
- US 6003303 A 19991221 - PETER-HOBLYN JEREMY D [GB], et al
- WO 9634074 A1 19961031 - ASS OCTEL [GB], et al
- WO 9634075 A1 19961031 - ASS OCTEL [GB], et al
- WO 0011119 A1 20000302 - ASS OCTEL [GB], et al
- US 3438756 A 19690415 - LINDSTROM EDDIE G
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 04255073 A 20040824