Global Patent Index - EP 1513069 B8

EP 1513069 B8 2009-02-18 - Resource management apparatus

Title (en)

Resource management apparatus

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Verwaltung von Ressourcen

Title (fr)

Appareil pour gérer des ressources

Publication

EP 1513069 B8 (EN)

Application

EP 04020891 A

Priority

JP 2003312463 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1513069A2] A resource management apparatus comprises an information selection unit having an operation speed different to an operation speed of a common resource and selecting from information transferred from a plurality of bus masters, a buffer unit for storing the information selected by the information selection unit, and a timing adjustment unit for controlling timings of the information selections in the information selection unit. The information selection unit selects the information comprised of a command and data transferred from any of the plurality of bus masters to the common resource. The timing adjustment unit controls the timings of the information selections in the information selection unit so that the sum of time required for selecting a plurality of predetermined volumes of information in the information selection unit and the sum of processing time in the common resource are substantially equal to each other. <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/06 (2006.01); G06F 13/16 (2006.01); G06F 12/00 (2006.01); G06F 13/00 (2006.01); G06F 13/14 (2006.01); G06F 13/36 (2006.01); G06F 13/38 (2006.01); G06F 13/42 (2006.01); H04B 1/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 13/4243 (2013.01); G06F 13/1689 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1513069 A2 20050309; EP 1513069 A3 20050914; EP 1513069 B1 20081112; EP 1513069 B8 20090218; CN 1324498 C 20070704; CN 1591376 A 20050309; CN 1991813 A 20070704; DE 602004017678 D1 20081224; KR 20050025064 A 20050311; US 2005066097 A1 20050324

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081112

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090902

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-06-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100531

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090902

2009-10-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090813

2008-12-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602004017678 P 20081224

2008-11-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: PANASONIC CORPORATION

2008-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2008-11-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070518

2006-05-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060303

2005-09-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-09-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK

2005-03-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-03-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK