EP 1513376 B1 20170412 - Lighting system
Title (en)
Lighting system
Title (de)
Beleuchtungssystem
Title (fr)
Système d'éclairage
Publication
Application
Priority
EP 03020112 A 20030904
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP1513376A1] The illumination system has a number of lights (2) and a control/monitoring device (3) connected to the lights via data lines (4-7), whereby each light has an associated address code and a memory device for electronic storage of a unique address code that can be read out over the data line for light identification by the control/monitoring device.
IPC 8 full level
H05B 37/02 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
H05B 47/18 (2020.01)
Citation (opposition)
Opponent : Tridonic GmbH & Co KG
- US 5769527 A 19980623 - TAYLOR BROOKS W [US], et al
- WO 03094579 A2 20031113 - ENVIRONMENTAL MAN LTD [GB], et al
- EP 1195740 A2 20020410 - COLOR KINETICS INC [US]
- US 2002126020 A1 20020912 - WANG LING [US], et al
- WO 02069306 A2 20020906 - COLOR KINETICS INC [US]
- US 2002169914 A1 20021114 - SHTEYN YEVGENIY EUGENE [US]
- US 2002170952 A1 20021121 - ALSAFADI YASSER [US], et al
- EP 0433527 B1 19930922
- DE 3041896 A1 19820609 - LICENTIA GMBH [DE]
- DALI AG: "DALI Manual", November 2001 (2001-11-01), pages 5 - 64, XP002224999
- ZUMTOBEL LICHT GMBH: "4.1.1 Schalt/Dimm-Eingangsmodul LM-SDE", ZUMTOBEL DATENBLATT, August 1996 (1996-08-01), XP055452871
- ALBRECHT JUNG GMBH & CO.KG: "Bedienungsanleitung Universal-Dimmfaktor 1fach, 2fach", BROSCHÜRE JUNG UNIVERSAL DIMMAKTOR ART.-NR.:3601 REG/ 3602 REG, October 2002 (2002-10-01), pages 1 - 6, XP055452878
- ABB STITZ-KONTAKT/STRIEBEL & JOHN: "Luxcontrol Das volldigitale, universelle Lichtsteuersystem von ABB", BROSCHÜRE LUXCONTROL, 1999, pages 1 - 31, XP055452950
- SIEMENS AG: "Siemens easy starter for instabus EIB", BROCHURE SIEMENS, 2000, pages 1 - 39, XP055452953
- "EIBA Handbook Series Release 3.0 Volume 1: Primer Part 2: Introduction to the System,", 19 April 1999 (1999-04-19), pages 1 - 36, XP002669718
- TRIDONICATCO GMBH & CO KG: "DSI-EIB Control via EIB signal", TRIDONIC CATALOGUE 2002/2003, 2002, pages 117 - 118, XP055452967
- ZUMTOBEL LICHT GMBH: "5.9 Tageslichtsteuermodul LM-TLS", ZUMTOBEL DATENBLATT, August 1996 (1996-08-01), XP055452969
- ZUMTOBEL LICHT GMBH: "4.4 Infrarot-Eingangsmodul LM-IRB", ZUMTOBEL DATENBLATT, August 1996 (1996-08-01), XP055452975
Designated contracting state (EPC)
FR GB IT SE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1513376 A1 20050309; EP 1513376 B1 20170412; NO 20043704 D0 20040903; NO 20043704 L 20050307; NO 20161825 A1 20161118; NO 342050 B1 20180319
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 03020112 A 20030904; NO 20043704 A 20040903; NO 20161825 A 20161118