Global Patent Index - EP 1515029 B1

EP 1515029 B1 2009-02-25 - Exhaust purification system of an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Exhaust purification system of an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Abgasreinigungssystem für eine Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Système de purification des gaz d'échappement pour un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1515029 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 04021239 A

Priority

JP 2003321408 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1515029A2] In an exhaust purification system of an internal combustion engine (1) that includes a NOx catalyst (16) for occluding and reducing NOx in exhaust, when removing SOx deposited in the NOx catalyst, a concentration of sulfur in a fuel is detected, and an amount of SOx deposited in the NOx catalyst is estimated taking into consideration the concentration of sulfur in the fuel. Further, an air-fuel ratio of exhaust flowing into the NOx catalyst (16) is changed to a richer side air-fuel ratio depending on a decrease in the estimated SOx amount, thereby adjusting an HC concentration of exhaust flowing out from the NOx catalyst (16) to a level equal to or less than a permissible HC concentration.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/08 (2006.01); F02D 41/02 (2006.01); B01D 53/94 (2006.01); F01N 3/00 (2006.01); F01N 3/20 (2006.01); F01N 3/28 (2006.01); F01N 3/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/028 (2013.01); F02D 2200/0611 (2013.01); F02D 2200/0818 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1515029 A2 20050316; EP 1515029 A3 20060607; EP 1515029 B1 20090225; DE 602004019609 D1 20090409; ES 2318225 T3 20090501; JP 2005090253 A 20050407; JP 4241279 B2 20090318

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160908

2017-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160907

2017-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160930

2017-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170401

2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160907

2017-06-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170531

2017-05-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160907

2017-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 602004019609

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150925

- Year of fee payment: 12

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150629

- Year of fee payment: 12

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150902

- Year of fee payment: 12

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150902

- Year of fee payment: 12

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150810

- Year of fee payment: 12

2015-06-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-08-14 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 602004019609

- Effective date: 20130614

2013-07-17 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20130624

2010-02-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091126

2009-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2318225 T3

2009-04-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602004019609 P 20090409

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2009-02-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061106

2007-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2006-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061106

2006-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK

2005-03-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040907

2005-03-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-03-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK