Global Patent Index - EP 1515403 B1

EP 1515403 B1 2007-10-24 - Cable processing apparatus

Title (en)

Cable processing apparatus

Title (de)

Kabelbearbeitungseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de traitement de câble

Publication

EP 1515403 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 04405534 A

Priority

  • EP 04405534 A
  • EP 03405664 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1515403A2] The apparatus has a belt drive (2) to guide a wire (3) to a swivel arm (4) with a gripper (5). A leading end of the wire is fed to processing stations by setting the arm into a swivel motion and/or a linear motion. A holder (20) inspects a wire end connection or a crimp connection. The gripper holds the wire with pull out force in a longitudinal axis of the wire by linear movement away from the holder. An independent claim is also included for an inspection method for operating a wire-processing apparatus.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/048 (2006.01); G01R 31/04 (2006.01); H01R 43/052 (2006.01); H01R 43/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/052 (2013.01); H01R 43/0488 (2013.01); H01R 43/28 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49004 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49117 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49174 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49204 (2013.01); Y10T 29/5149 (2013.01); Y10T 29/5151 (2013.01); Y10T 29/5193 (2013.01); Y10T 29/5313 (2013.01); Y10T 29/532 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53213 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53217 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53235 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1515403 A2 20050316; EP 1515403 A3 20060517; EP 1515403 B1 20071024; US 2005050722 A1 20050310; US 7603768 B2 20091020

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 13

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160829

- Year of fee payment: 13

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 13

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 13

2016-08-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090826

2010-04-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090826

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080821

- Year of fee payment: 5

2008-10-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080725

2008-04-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: INVENTIO AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2007-12-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20071205

2007-12-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502004005315 P 20071206

2007-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2007-10-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2007-01-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061214

2006-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20061028

2006-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK

2005-03-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-03-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK