Global Patent Index - EP 1517359 B1

EP 1517359 B1 2007-10-10 - Method of manufacturing of a flat discharge lamp with spacer elements

Title (en)

Method of manufacturing of a flat discharge lamp with spacer elements

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung einer flachen Entladungslampe mit Abstandselementen

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'une lampe à decharge plate avec pièces d'écartement

Publication

EP 1517359 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 04019086 A

Priority

DE 10343073 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1517359A2] The method involves providing a solder bath comprising solder paste (5). One end of spacers (3) that are provided between a frame and a cover plate is dipped in the bath. The dipped-in end of the spacer is then applied to an inner side of a base plate (6) such that the spacers adhere to the inner side of the plate by the solder paste from the solder bath.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 9/24 (2006.01); H01J 61/30 (2006.01); H01J 9/26 (2006.01); H01J 65/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 9/247 (2013.01); H01J 9/266 (2013.01); H01J 61/305 (2013.01); H01J 65/046 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1517359 A2 20050323; EP 1517359 A3 20060614; EP 1517359 B1 20071010; AT 375601 T 20071015; CA 2481289 A1 20050317; CN 1599004 A 20050323; DE 10343073 A1 20050421; DE 502004005186 D1 20071122; JP 2005100984 A 20050414; KR 100646896 B1 20061123; KR 20050028314 A 20050322; TW 200523979 A 20050716; TW I261859 B 20060911; US 2005059312 A1 20050317

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-06-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 502004005186

- Effective date: 20110301

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091019

- Year of fee payment: 6

2009-10-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080811

2009-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080831

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071010

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080725

2008-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080711

2008-07-25 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2008-05-07 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

2008-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071010

2008-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2007-11-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502004005186 P 20071122

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB NL

2007-10-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB NL

2006-10-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060911

2006-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060710

2006-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK

2005-03-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-03-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK