Global Patent Index - EP 1518798 B1

EP 1518798 B1 2007-10-10 - PLATE-LIKE OBJECT CONVEYING EQUIPMENT

Title (en)

PLATE-LIKE OBJECT CONVEYING EQUIPMENT

Title (de)

EINRICHTUNG ZUR BEFÖRDERUNG VON PLATTENFÖRMIGEN OBJEKTEN

Title (fr)

EQUIPEMENT DE TRANSPORT D'UN OBJET DE TYPE PLAQUE

Publication

EP 1518798 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 02790739 A

Priority

  • JP 0213027 W
  • JP 2002178560 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1518798A1] A plate-shaped article carrier that enables vibration/movement of plate-shaped articles during carriage to be reliably prevented. A glass plate carrier 100 is comprised of a frame 20 comprised of a floor plate frame 21 and supporting pillars 22, partitioning beams 40 erected on the floor plate frame 21 such that glass plates 10 can be stored therebetween, a pair of end'panel frames 50 erected between the supporting pillars 22, and upper beams 60 that restrain upper edges of the stored glass plates 10. Each of the end panel frames 50 is comprised of eight pipes 51 arranged vertically, sliding guides 52, and stoppers 53 fixed to the sliding guides 52. Each of the upper beams 60 is laid horizontally over the upper edge of the corresponding glass plate 10, and is fixed to a pair of the pipes 51 that face one another. During carriage of the glass plates 10, the upper beams 60 are placed on the upper edges of the glass plates 10, and the upper beams 60 are supported by the frame 20 via the end panels 50. <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 85/00 (2006.01); B65D 85/48 (2006.01); B65D 19/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 85/48 (2013.01); B65D 19/44 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1518798 A1 20050330; EP 1518798 A4 20051116; EP 1518798 B1 20071010; AU 2002368038 A1 20040106; CN 1628061 A 20050615; DE 60222941 D1 20071122; JP 2004018069 A 20040122; JP 3969713 B2 20070905; WO 2004000692 A1 20031231

INPADOC legal status


2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091212

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-08-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091212

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081210

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081212

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080111

2008-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080711

2008-05-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-11-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60222941 P 20071122

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-10-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-08-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060317

2005-11-16 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20051005

2005-10-12 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2005-10-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-03-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050119

2005-03-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2005-03-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO