EP 1520942 B1 20181107 - Surface drainage
Title (en)
Surface drainage
Title (de)
Oberflächenentwässerung
Title (fr)
Drainage superficiel
Publication
Application
Priority
GB 0323198 A 20031003
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP1520942A1] A drainage channel section 1 comprises a longitudinally extending pipe portion 2, and a longitudinal slot 3 that lies, in use, in a surface to be drained and that is adapted to be in liquid communication with the pipe portion 2. The drainage channel section 1 comprises one or more transverse openings into which a material in which the channel section is embedded in use can extend from either side of the channel section 1 to form a structural bridge member. <IMAGE>
IPC 8 full level
E03F 3/04 (2006.01); E01C 11/22 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP GB)
E01C 11/227 (2013.01 - EP GB); E03F 3/046 (2013.01 - EP GB)
Citation (opposition)
Opponent : Hauraton GmbH & Co. KG,
- EP 1380691 A2 20040114 - AHLMANN ACO SEVERIN [DE]
- US 6000881 A 19991214 - BECKER ALLEN R [US], et al
- AU 733361 B2 20010510 - CREIGHTON JOHN JOSEPH
- US 4815888 A 19890328 - STEGMEIER WILLIAM J [US]
- GB 2222624 A 19900314 - CIDAR LIMITED [GB]
- ZURN INDUSTRIES: "Z-888-18-DYN-HP Heelproof High Capacity Trench Drain System", PRODUCT DATA SHEET, 9 August 2001 (2001-08-09), XP055578478
- ZURN INDUSTRIES: "Z-888-12-DYN Hi-Cap slotted drainage system for dynamic/airport loading", PRODUCT DATA SHEET, 5 December 2003 (2003-12-05), XP055578480
- ZURN INDUSTRIES: "Z-888-36-DYN HI-Cap slotted drainage system", PRODUCT DATA SHEET, 22 October 2001 (2001-10-22), XP055578482
- ZURN INDUSTRIES: "Z-888 High-Capacity Trench", INSTALLATION INSTRUCTIONS, 28 June 2000 (2000-06-28), pages 1 - 8, pp, XP055578484
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1520942 A1 20050406; EP 1520942 B1 20181107; GB 0323198 D0 20031105; GB 2406602 A 20050406; GB 2406602 B 20080514; PL 1520942 T3 20190430
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 04255632 A 20040916; GB 0323198 A 20031003; PL 04255632 T 20040916