EP 1520973 A3 20050413 - Internal combustion engine with exhaust pipe
Title (en)
Internal combustion engine with exhaust pipe
Title (de)
Brennkraftmaschine mit Abgaskrümmer
Title (fr)
Moteur à combustion interne avec tubulure d'échappement
Publication
Application
Priority
DE 10345829 A 20031002
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP1520973A2] The internal combustion engine for a motor vehicle has a combustion chamber with an inlet port for the feed of combustion gas, an exhaust port for the discharge of combustion products, and a fuel supply unit for the feed of liquid fuel. The exhaust port is located in an exhaust manifold of thin-walled metal sheet with a roughened inner surface for the absorption of unburnt or partially burnt fuel. The exhaust manifold is constructed from at least two separate part shells formed in a non-cutting process, with the inner surfaces roughened by a non-cutting and/or a cutting treatment.
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
F01N 7/10 (2006.01); F01N 7/18 (2006.01); F01N 13/10 (2010.01); F01N 13/18 (2010.01)
CPC (source: EP)
F01N 13/10 (2013.01); F01N 13/18 (2013.01); F01N 2510/00 (2013.01); F01N 2530/26 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [X] US 4930678 A 19900605 - CYB FREDERICK F [US]
- [PX] EP 1411218 A2 20040421 - ATJ AUTOTECHNIK GMBH [DE]
- [A] US 6038769 A 20000321 - BONNY PIERRE [DE], et al
- [E] EP 1489292 A1 20041222 - DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]
- [E] DE 10311488 A1 20040923 - GILLET HEINRICH GMBH [DE]
- [A] US 5493859 A 19960227 - SHINOHARA YUKIHIRO [JP], et al
- [A] DE 10048286 A1 20020411 - AUDI AG [DE]
- [A] US 6230490 B1 20010515 - SUZUKI TAKEHIRO [JP], et al
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 544 (M - 1489) 30 September 1993 (1993-09-30)
- [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 006, no. 063 (C - 099) 22 April 1982 (1982-04-22)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 13 5 February 2001 (2001-02-05)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1520973 A2 20050406; EP 1520973 A3 20050413; DE 10345829 A1 20050421
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 04021305 A 20040908; DE 10345829 A 20031002