Global Patent Index - EP 1524892 A3

EP 1524892 A3 2009-02-25 - Operating circuit with heat sink for lamp

Title (en)

Operating circuit with heat sink for lamp

Title (de)

Betriebsschaltung für Lampe mit Kühlkörper

Title (fr)

Circuit pourvu d'un radiateur pour alimenter une lampe

Publication

EP 1524892 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 04022552 A

Priority

DE 10348421 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1524892A2] The circuit has electronic components (4) which produce operating heat during operation, and a circuit board (1) on which the electronic components are mounted. A heat sink (6`) dissipates the operating heat from the electronic components. The electronic components rest flat on a contact surface of the heat sink, where the contact surface includes an angle of 10-70 degrees with the circuit board. An independent claim is also included for a method for mounting an electronic component.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05K 7/20 (2006.01); G12B 15/06 (2006.01); H05B 37/00 (2006.01); H05B 41/02 (2006.01); H05K 1/00 (2006.01); H05K 1/18 (2006.01); H05K 3/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/02 (2013.01); H05K 3/301 (2013.01); H05K 2201/066 (2013.01); H05K 2201/10166 (2013.01); H05K 2201/10484 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL HR LT LV MK

EPO simple patent family

EP 1524892 A2 20050420; EP 1524892 A3 20090225; CA 2484471 A1 20050414; CN 100475014 C 20090401; CN 1630463 A 20050622; DE 10348421 A1 20050602; JP 2005123615 A 20050512; KR 100635686 B1 20061017; KR 20050036756 A 20050420; TW 200520622 A 20050616; TW I289029 B 20071021; US 2005078458 A1 20050414; US 7046512 B2 20060516

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2010-03-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090826

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK

2005-04-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-04-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK