Global Patent Index - EP 1525375 B1

EP 1525375 B1 2009-02-11 - METHOD OF DETERMINING A CLEARANCE

Title (en)

METHOD OF DETERMINING A CLEARANCE

Title (de)

SPIELERMITTLUNGSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE DETERMINATION D'UN JEU

Publication

EP 1525375 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 03750797 A

Priority

  • FR 0302170 W
  • FR 0209434 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2004016912A1] The invention relates to a method of determining a clearance between a valve (1) stem (3) of a heat engine (2) and a mobile element (8) of an electromagnetic actuator (7) comprising electromagnetic means (14, 15) which are used to move said mobile element between an end valve open position and an end valve closed position. The aforementioned electromagnetic movement means are controlled using automatic control means according to a set current. The inventive method comprises steps consisting in controlling the electromagnetic means in order to: obtain an essentially constant movement speed for the aforementioned mobile element moving between the end closed position and the end open position, obtain the values of the set electrical characteristic for intermediary positions of the mobile element and detect an intermediary position for which the set electrical characteristic undergoes a sudden variation.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2013.01); F01L 2009/0436 (2013.01); F01L 2009/0471 (2013.01); F01L 2009/0498 (2013.01); F01L 2800/00 (2013.01); Y10T 137/0318 (2015.04); Y10T 137/8158 (2015.04); Y10T 137/8225 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2842862 A1 20040130; FR 2842862 B1 20060303; DE 60326145 D1 20090326; EP 1525375 A1 20050427; EP 1525375 B1 20090211; JP 2006501391 A 20060112; JP 4048201 B2 20080220; US 2005269536 A1 20051208; US 7121525 B2 20061017; WO 2004016912 A1 20040226

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170710

2018-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170731

2018-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170710

2018-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20180201

2018-04-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180330

2018-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170710

2018-02-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60326145

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160725

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160731

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-07-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-01-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091112

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090522

2009-03-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60326145 P 20090326

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2009-02-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-06-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALEO SYSTEMES DE CONTROLE MOTEUR

2005-11-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-04-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041228

2005-04-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR