Global Patent Index - EP 1528631 B1

EP 1528631 B1 2009-02-18 - Solderless connection system for printed circuits

Title (en)

Solderless connection system for printed circuits

Title (de)

Lötfreies Verbindungssystem für Leiterplatten

Title (fr)

Système de connexion sans soudure pour cartes a circuits imprimés

Publication

EP 1528631 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 04025391 A

Priority

FR 0312561 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1528631A1] The system has conducting contact units (24) projecting along a direction perpendicular to a plane of a printed circuit board (12), to be in electrical contact with corresponding conducting drop terminals (16) of an external circuit (14). The terminals have main segments coaxial with contact units, and folded end segments (44) contacting a clamp (30) to contact the contact units and being in a plane parallel to the board`s plane.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/115 (2006.01); H01R 12/16 (2006.01); H01R 12/22 (2006.01); H01R 13/11 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/112 (2013.01); H01R 12/7076 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1528631 A1 20050504; EP 1528631 B1 20090218; DE 602004019486 D1 20090402; ES 2322150 T3 20090617; FR 2861505 A1 20050429; FR 2861505 B1 20100903

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170920

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170921

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151027

2016-11-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20161129

2016-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151027

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151026

2016-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151026

2016-05-31 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-01-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20141003

- Year of fee payment: 11

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140924

- Year of fee payment: 11

2014-11-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140925

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091119

2009-06-17 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2322150 T3

2009-04-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602004019486 P 20090402

2009-03-17 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT SE

2009-02-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-06-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MAGNETI MARELLI FRANCE S.A.S

2006-01-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT SE

2005-12-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20051028

2005-05-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-05-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK