Global Patent Index - EP 1529915 A3

EP 1529915 A3 2009-02-11 - System for moving an automatic gate

Title (en)

System for moving an automatic gate

Title (de)

Antriebssystem für automatisches Tor

Title (fr)

Système de commande pour portail automatique

Publication

EP 1529915 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 04078065 A

Priority

IT MI20032159 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1529915A2] System for moving an automatic gate, said gate comprising a mobile door, suitable for covering an access space defined at the ends by fixed parts of said gate, the movement of which is commanded by a main electric motor supplied with mains power. The system comprises an auxiliary electric motor, supplied with power by a battery, enabled for operation during an emergency situation that deactivates the main motor and activated to move such a door by an external activation command.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/12 (2006.01); E05F 15/10 (2006.01); E05F 15/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/603 (2013.01); E05F 15/616 (2013.01); E05F 15/72 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/434 (2013.01); E05Y 2400/612 (2013.01); E05Y 2400/614 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/205 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/21 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/244 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/246 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/25 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL HR LT LV MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1529915 A2 20050511; EP 1529915 A3 20090211; IT MI20032159 A1 20050511

INPADOC legal status


2012-06-15 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1080293

2011-01-19 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100626

2010-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100215

2009-10-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-09-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090723

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK YU

2009-02-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05F 15/12 20060101AFI20050224BHEP

2009-02-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05F 15/10 20060101ALI20090107BHEP

2006-04-21 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1080293

2005-05-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-05-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK YU