Global Patent Index - EP 1530223 B1

EP 1530223 B1 2009-02-04 - HIGH THERMAL CONDUCTIVITY INSULATING MEMBER AND ITS MANUFACTURING METHOD, ELECTROMAGNETIC COIL, AND ELECTROMAGNETIC DEVICE

Title (en)

HIGH THERMAL CONDUCTIVITY INSULATING MEMBER AND ITS MANUFACTURING METHOD, ELECTROMAGNETIC COIL, AND ELECTROMAGNETIC DEVICE

Title (de)

ISOLATIONSELEMENT MIT HOHER THERMISCHER LEITFÄHIGKEIT, VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG, ELEKTROMAGNETISCHE SPULE UND ELEKTROMAGNETISCHE VORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

ELEMENT ISOLANT A CONDUCTIVITE THERMIQUE ELEVEE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION, BOBINE ELECTROMAGNETIQUE ET DISPOSITIF ELECTROMAGNETIQUE

Publication

EP 1530223 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 03741216 A

Priority

  • JP 0308564 W
  • JP 2002196363 A
  • JP 2003144919 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1530223A1] The present invention provides a solution to the above-described drawbacks, and more specifically, as the tape-like or sheet-like insulation member, the resin matrix in which the first particles having a heat conductivity of 1 W/mK or higher and 300 W/mK or lower, that are diffused in the resin matrix, and the second particles having a heat conductivity of 0.5 W/mK or higher and 300 W/mK or lower, are diffused, is employed. <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 3/00 (2006.01); H01B 17/60 (2006.01); H01B 19/00 (2006.01); H01F 5/06 (2006.01); H01F 27/22 (2006.01); H01F 27/32 (2006.01); H01F 41/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 41/127 (2013.01); H01F 27/22 (2013.01); H01F 5/06 (2013.01); H01F 27/323 (2013.01); H01F 27/327 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1530223 A1 20050511; EP 1530223 A4 20060628; EP 1530223 B1 20090204; CN 1324615 C 20070704; CN 1666303 A 20050907; DE 60326072 D1 20090319; WO 2004006271 A1 20040115

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170627

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170712

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170613

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-06-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-06-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-01-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091105

2009-03-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60326072 P 20090319

2009-02-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-02-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI

2006-06-28 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20060529

2005-10-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI

2005-05-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050104

2005-05-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR