Global Patent Index - EP 1531725 A4

EP 1531725 A4 2009-02-04 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MAKING NONINVASIVE ASSESSMENTS OF CARDIAC TISSUE AND PARAMETERS

Title (en)

SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MAKING NONINVASIVE ASSESSMENTS OF CARDIAC TISSUE AND PARAMETERS

Title (de)

SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG NICHTINVASIVER BEURTEILUNGEN VON HERZGEWEBE UND PARAMETER

Title (fr)

SYSTEMES ET PROCEDES D'EVALUATION NON INVASIVE D'UN TISSU CARDIAQUE, ET PARAMETRES S'Y RAPPORTANT

Publication

EP 1531725 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 03742372 A

Priority

  • US 0320764 W
  • US 39329302 P
  • US 47580303 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2004002305A2] Systems and methods for noninvasive assessment of cardiac tissue properties and cardiac parameters using ultrasound techniques are disclosed. Determinations of myocardial tissue stiffness, tension, strain, strain rate, and the like, may be used to assess myocardial contractility, myocardial ischemia and infarction, ventricular filling and atrial pressures, and diastolic functions. Non-invasive systems in which acoustic techniques, such as ultrasound, are employed to acquire data relating to intrinsic tissue displacements are disclosed. Non-invasive systems in which ultrasound techniques are used to acoustically stimulate or palpate target cardiac tissue, or induce a response at a cardiac tissue site that relates to cardiac tissue properties and/or cardiac parameters are also disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 5/05; A61B 5/00; A61B 6/00; A61B 8/00; A61B 8/12; A61B 8/14; A61M 16/00; G01N 24/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 8/06 (2006.01); A61B 8/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61B 8/485 (2013.01); A61B 8/065 (2013.01); A61B 8/08 (2013.01); A61B 8/0883 (2013.01); A61B 5/4519 (2013.01); A61B 6/503 (2013.01); A61B 6/504 (2013.01); A61B 8/04 (2013.01); A61B 8/0808 (2013.01); A61B 8/0891 (2013.01); A61B 8/4236 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2004002305 A2 20040108; WO 2004002305 A3 20040304; AU 2003280416 A1 20040119; AU 2003280416 A8 20040119; CA 2490999 A1 20040108; EP 1531725 A2 20050525; EP 1531725 A4 20090204; JP 2005532097 A 20051027

INPADOC legal status


2011-02-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100902

2010-05-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100421

2009-02-04 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090108

2008-08-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHYSIOSONICS, INC.

2008-08-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: UNIVERSITY OF WASHINGTON; MR. DAVID P. BROWN

2008-08-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MOURAD, PIERRE

2008-08-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KLIOT, MICHEL

2008-08-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PATTERSON, REX

2005-10-19 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2005-05-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041227

2005-05-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-05-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK