Global Patent Index - EP 1532586 A2

EP 1532586 A2 20050525 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CREATING A TWO-DIMENSIONAL REPRESENTATION OF A THREE-DIMENSIONAL STRUCTURE

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CREATING A TWO-DIMENSIONAL REPRESENTATION OF A THREE-DIMENSIONAL STRUCTURE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINER ZWEIDIMENSIONALEN ABBILDUNG EINER DREIDIMENSIONALEN STRUKTUR

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR REPRESENTER EN DEUX DIMENSIONS UNE STRUCTURE TRIDIMENSIONNELLE

Publication

EP 1532586 A2 20050525 (DE)

Application

EP 03790730 A 20030820

Priority

  • DE 0302801 W 20030820
  • DE 10239672 A 20020826

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2004021274A2] The invention relates to a method and a device for two-dimensionally representing a three-dimensional world, in which rays are combined into packets during ray tracing, and said packets of rays are processed in adequate steps.

IPC 1-7

G06T 15/40; G06T 15/70

IPC 8 full level

G06T 15/06 (2011.01); G06T 15/40 (2011.01); G06T 15/50 (2011.01)

CPC (source: EP US)

G06T 15/06 (2013.01 - EP US); G06T 15/40 (2013.01 - EP US); G06T 15/50 (2013.01 - EP US)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2004021274A2

Citation (examination)

  • WALD I; BENTHIN C; SLUSALLEK P: "A SIMPLE AND PRACTICAL METHOD FOR INTERACTIVE RAY TRACING OF DYNAMIC SCENES", TECHNICAL REPORT SAARLAND UNIVERSITY, 2000, Saarbrücken, pages 1 - 12, XP001091428
  • BRIERE N; POULIN P: "HIERARCHICAL VIEW-DEPENDENT STRUCTURES FOR INTERACTIVE SCENE MANIPULATION", COMPUTER GRAPHICS PROCEEDINGS 1996 (SIGGRAPH). NEW ORLEANS, AUG. 4 -9, 1996, 4 August 1996 (1996-08-04) - 9 August 1996 (1996-08-09), pages 83 - 90, XP000682724
  • DAS S K ET AL: "Cost-optimal parallel algorithms for traversing trees", PROCEEDINGS OF SOUTHEASTCON. WILLIAMSBURG, APRIL 7 - 10, 1991; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE SOUTHEAST CONFERENCE], NEW YORK, IEEE, US, vol. -, 7 April 1991 (1991-04-07), pages 474 - 478, XP010045146, ISBN: 978-0-7803-0033-0, DOI: 10.1109/SECON.1991.147799

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

DOCDB simple family (publication)

WO 2004021274 A2 20040311; WO 2004021274 A3 20040429; AU 2003266174 A1 20040319; AU 2003266174 A8 20040319; DE 10239672 A1 20040311; DE 10239672 B4 20050811; EP 1532586 A2 20050525; JP 2005536813 A 20051202; JP 4348728 B2 20091021; US 2006066607 A1 20060330; US 7289118 B2 20071030; US RE44347 E 20130709

DOCDB simple family (application)

DE 0302801 W 20030820; AU 2003266174 A 20030820; DE 10239672 A 20020826; EP 03790730 A 20030820; JP 2004531696 A 20030820; US 52605505 A 20050919; US 60886405 A 20050919