EP 1533512 A3 20060517 - Intake device for an internal combustion engine
Title (en)
Intake device for an internal combustion engine
Title (de)
Sauganlage für eine Brennkraftmaschine
Title (fr)
Dispositif d'admission pour un moteur à combustion interne
Publication
Application
Priority
DE 10354129 A 20031119
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP1533512A2] The induction unit (1) has at least one fresh gas distributor (2) to supply air to several cylinders, with a fresh air outlet (4) for each cylinder alongside each other. A distribution channel (12) from an exhaust gas return device (8) is fitted to the fresh air distributor alongside all the fresh gas outlets and communicating with the fresh gas distributor.
IPC 8 full level
F02M 25/07 (2006.01); F02M 35/10 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
F02M 26/19 (2016.02); F02M 26/21 (2016.02); F02M 26/25 (2016.02); F02M 26/28 (2016.02); F02M 26/30 (2016.02); F02M 26/42 (2016.02); F02M 35/10052 (2013.01); F02M 35/10144 (2013.01); F02M 35/10222 (2013.01); F02M 35/10288 (2013.01); F02M 35/10354 (2013.01); F02M 35/1045 (2013.01); F02M 35/112 (2013.01); F02M 26/12 (2016.02)
Citation (search report)
- [XA] EP 1122421 A2 20010808 - MANN & HUMMEL FILTER [DE]
- [XAY] US 5957116 A 19990928 - HAEGELE GLEN T [US], et al
- [YA] EP 1164280 A2 20011219 - PIERBURG AG [DE]
- [XA] EP 1319825 A1 20030618 - MAGNETI MARELLI POWERTRAIN SPA [IT]
- [XA] DE 10028131 C1 20011213 - DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]
- [XA] EP 0565410 A1 19931013 - PEUGEOT [FR], et al
- [XA] US 4715329 A 19871229 - YASUDA MAKOTO [JP], et al
- [XA] EP 1152131 A1 20011107 - VOLVO PERSONVAGNAR AB [SE]
- [A] EP 1273786 A2 20030108 - PIERBURG GMBH [DE]
- [T] WO 2005024220 A1 20050317 - PIERBURG GMBH [DE], et al
- [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 10 31 October 1996 (1996-10-31)
- [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 080 (M - 1368) 17 February 1993 (1993-02-17)
- [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 08 30 June 1999 (1999-06-30)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1533512 A2 20050525; EP 1533512 A3 20060517; EP 1533512 B1 20080326; DE 10354129 A1 20050623; DE 502004006651 D1 20080508; DE 502004009844 D1 20090910; EP 1870591 A2 20071226; EP 1870591 A3 20080220; EP 1870591 B1 20090729
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 04026887 A 20041112; DE 10354129 A 20031119; DE 502004006651 T 20041112; DE 502004009844 T 20041112; EP 07118191 A 20041112