Global Patent Index - EP 1535354 A4

EP 1535354 A4 2007-10-31 - CURED COMPOSITE MATERIALS FOR REACTIVE METAL BATTERY ELECTROLYTES

Title (en)

CURED COMPOSITE MATERIALS FOR REACTIVE METAL BATTERY ELECTROLYTES

Title (de)

AUSGEHûRTETE VERBUNDMATERIALIEN F R REAKTIVE METALLBATTERIEELEKTROLYTE

Title (fr)

MATERIAUX COMPOSITES DURCIS POUR ELECTROLYTES DE BATTERIES A METAL REACTIF

Publication

EP 1535354 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 03764567 A

Priority

  • US 0321817 W
  • US 19437602 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2004008558A2] A solid molecular composite polymer-based electrolyte is made for batteries, wherein silicate compositing produces a electrolytic polymer with a semi-rigid silicate condensate framework, and then mechanical-stabilization by radiation of the outer surface of the composited material is done to form a durable and non-tacky texture on the electrolyte. The preferred ultraviolet radiation produces this desirable outer surface by creating a thin, shallow skin of crosslinked polymer on the composite material. Preferably, a shirt-duration of low-medium range ultraviolet radiation is used to crosslink the polymers only a short distance into the polymer, so that the properties of the bulk of the polymer and the bulk of the molecular composite material remain unchanged, but the tough and stable skin formed on the outer surface lends durability and processability to the entire composite material product.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01M 2/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08J 7/00 (2006.01); C08K 5/541 (2006.01); C08L 83/10 (2006.01); C08L 85/02 (2006.01); C08L 101/12 (2006.01); H01B 1/06 (2006.01); H01B 13/00 (2006.01); H01M 2/00 (2006.01); H01M 4/40 (2006.01); H01M 4/46 (2006.01); H01M 4/62 (2006.01); H01M 6/04 (2006.01); H01M 6/18 (2006.01); H01M 6/32 (2006.01); H01M 6/34 (2006.01); H01M 10/056 (2010.01); H01M 10/08 (2006.01); H01M 10/36 (2010.01); H01M 10/052 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01M 10/056 (2013.01); H01M 4/621 (2013.01); H01M 6/04 (2013.01); H01M 6/34 (2013.01); H01M 10/052 (2013.01); H01M 2300/0091 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [YA] US 6146787 A 20001114 - HARRUP MASON K [US], et al
  • [A] WO 0117051 A1 20010308 - LITHIUM POWER TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]
  • [A] EP 0492858 A2 19920701 - ICI PLC [GB]
  • [XY] B.K. COLTRAIN AND AL: "Polyphosphazene molecular composites. 1. Insitu polymerization of tetraethoxysilane", CHEMISTRY OF MATERIALS, vol. 4, no. 2, 1992, pages 358 - 364, XP002451553
  • [XY] GUGLIELMI M ET AL: "POLY(ORGANOPHOSPHAZENE)S AND THE SOL-GEL TECHNIQUE", APPLIED ORGANOMETALLIC CHEMISTRY, HARLOW, GB, vol. 13, 1999, pages 339 - 351, XP002948884, ISSN: 0268-2605
  • [XY] CHULHEE KIM AND AL: "Ionic conduction of sol-gel derived polyphosphazene/silicate hybrid network", SYNTHETIC METALS, 1998, pages 153 - 156, XP002451554
  • [X] M. GUGLIELMI AND AL: "Hybrid materials based on the reaction of polyorganophosphazenes and SiO2 precursors", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS RESEARCH, vol. 11, no. 8, August 1996 (1996-08-01), pages 2029 - 2034, XP002451555
  • See also references of WO 2004008558A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2004008558 A2 20040122; WO 2004008558 A3 20040610; AU 2003247864 A1 20040202; AU 2003247864 A8 20040202; BR 0312520 A 20050419; CA 2491246 A1 20040122; CA 2491246 C 20091229; CN 100382375 C 20080416; CN 1669173 A 20050914; EP 1535354 A2 20050601; EP 1535354 A4 20071031; HK 1080220 A1 20080829; JP 2005531685 A 20051020; JP 4164768 B2 20081015; KR 100664819 B1 20070104; KR 20050032570 A 20050407; MX PA05000154 A 20050411; US 2004009404 A1 20040115; US 7008564 B2 20060307

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-14 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100119

2008-08-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BATTELLE ENERGY ALLIANCE, LLC

2008-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080228

2007-10-31 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20071002

2005-11-02 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2005-06-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050111

2005-06-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-06-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK