Global Patent Index - EP 1536065 B1

EP 1536065 B1 2009-02-25 - Antistatic paper and panel

Title (en)

Antistatic paper and panel

Title (de)

Antistatisches Papier nebst Paneel

Title (fr)

Papier antistatique et panneau de plancher

Publication

EP 1536065 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 04103947 A

Priority

DE 20318290 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2486629A1] The present invention is directed to paper, in particular decor paper, comprising an application of abrasion-resistant particles. The abrasion-resistant particles are embedded in a resin. The paper is suitable for use in the manufacture of flooring panels. The flooring panels manufactured using the paper of the present invention are anti-static and exhibit lower static electricity activity than similar products.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21H 27/18 (2006.01); D21H 17/45 (2006.01); D21H 27/26 (2006.01); E04F 15/02 (2006.01); E04F 15/024 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 15/02 (2013.01); D21H 27/26 (2013.01); E04F 2290/048 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24802 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20318290 U1 20040401; AT 423869 T 20090315; CA 2486629 A1 20050526; CA 2486629 C 20100420; DE 502004009041 D1 20090409; DK 1536065 T3 20090518; EP 1536065 A1 20050601; EP 1536065 B1 20090225; EP 1536065 B8 20090415; ES 2322258 T3 20090618; PT 1536065 E 20090512; SI 1536065 T1 20090430; US 2005112335 A1 20050526; US 2007269640 A1 20071122

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171011

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170814

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-11-30 [PGFP SI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Payment date: 20170731

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170821

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-11-30 [PGFP PL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Payment date: 20170710

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170829

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170906

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170815

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170818

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170817

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-10-31 [PGFP RO] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Payment date: 20170807

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-09-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20170828

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-09-29 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20170407

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-09-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170814

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-08-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-07-31 [PGFP CZ] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Payment date: 20170622

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-07-31 [PGFP SK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Payment date: 20170622

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-08-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2015-12-31 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-10-31 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2014-09-30 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130831

2014-08-29 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2013-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120831

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110819

2013-04-30 [PG25 HU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120819

2013-04-02 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2012-11-30 [PGFP BG] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Payment date: 20120808

- Year of fee payment: 9

2012-07-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110818

2012-05-31 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-05-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120302

2012-05-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110818

2012-05-23 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2012-04-25 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20090401352

- Effective date: 20120302

2012-04-16 [REG EE MM4A] LAPSED BY NOT PAYING THE ANNUAL FEES

- Document: EE E003179

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-04-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-11-30 [PGFP HU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Payment date: 20110804

- Year of fee payment: 8

2011-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20110805

- Year of fee payment: 8

2011-09-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090225

2011-03-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: INTERGLARION LIMITED

- Free text: INTERGLARION LIMITED#2 ANDREA ZAKOU STREET#2404 ENGOMI, NIKOSIA (CY) -TRANSFER TO- INTERGLARION LIMITED#2 ANDREA ZAKOU STREET#2404 ENGOMI, NIKOSIA (CY)

2010-12-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20100727

- Year of fee payment: 7

2010-11-30 [PGFP EE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Payment date: 20100707

- Year of fee payment: 7

2010-11-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20100820

- Year of fee payment: 7

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100818

- Year of fee payment: 7

2010-07-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20100630

- Year of fee payment: 7

2010-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-02-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091126

2009-10-01 [NLXE] NL: OTHER COMMUNICATIONS CONCERNING EP-PATENTS (PART 3 HEADING XE)

- Free text: PAT. BUL. 07/2009, PAGE 993: CORR.: INTERGLARION LIMITED

2009-09-28 [REG HU AG4A] FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS

- Document: HU E005560

2009-07-31 [REG PL T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2009-06-18 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2322258 T3

2009-06-16 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2009-06-12 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20090401352

2009-05-18 [REG RO EPE] EP PATENT VALID IN ROMANIA

2009-05-18 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2009-05-12 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20090505

2009-05-06 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: INTERGLARION LIMITED

- Effective date: 20090318

2009-04-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502004009041 P 20090409

2009-04-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2009-03-18 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: INTERGLARION LIMITED

2009-02-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-02-27 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050701

2006-02-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-01-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KAINDL FLOORING GMBH

2005-08-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050701

2005-06-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041117

2005-06-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-06-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK