Global Patent Index - EP 1537114 B8

EP 1537114 B8 2007-10-03 - ORGANIC COMPOUNDS AS AGENTS FOR THE TREATMENT OF ALDOSTERONE MEDIATED CONDITIONS

Title (en)

ORGANIC COMPOUNDS AS AGENTS FOR THE TREATMENT OF ALDOSTERONE MEDIATED CONDITIONS

Title (de)

ORGANISCHE VERBINDUNGEN ALS MITTEL ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ALDOSTERONBEDINGTEN ZUSTÄNDEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSES ORGANIQUES SERVANT D'AGENTS POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'ETATS PATHOLOGIQUES INDUITS PAR L'ALDOSTERONE

Publication

EP 1537114 B8 (EN)

Application

EP 03784194 A

Priority

  • EP 0308720 W
  • US 40169302 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2004014914A1] Compounds of formula (I), provide pharmacological agents which are inhibitors of the P450 enzyme, aldosterone synthase, and thus may be employed for the treatment of aldosterone mediated conditions. Accordingly, the compounds of formula (I) may be employed for prevention, delay of progression, or treatment of hypokalemia, hypertension, congestive heart failure, renal failure, in particular, chronic renal failure, restenosis, atherosclerosis, syndrome X, obesity, nephropathy, post myocardial infarction, coronary heart diseases, increased formation of collagen, fibrosis, and remodeling following hypertension and endothelial dysfunction. Preferred are the compounds of formula (I) which are selective inhibitors of aldosterone synthase devoid of undesirable side effects due to general inhibition of cytochrome P450 enzymes.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 487/04 (2006.01); A61K 31/519 (2006.01); A61K 31/5517 (2006.01); A61P 5/40 (2006.01); C07D 235/00 (2006.01); C07D 241/00 (2006.01); C07D 243/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 487/04 (2013.01); C07D 471/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2004014914 A1 20040219; AT 335744 T 20060915; AU 2003253387 A1 20040225; BR 0313293 A 20050614; CA 2494636 A1 20040219; CN 100404535 C 20080723; CN 1688583 A 20051026; DE 60307483 D1 20060921; DE 60307483 T2 20070705; DK 1537114 T3 20061113; EP 1537114 A1 20050608; EP 1537114 B1 20060809; EP 1537114 B8 20071003; ES 2270143 T3 20070401; HK 1080290 A1 20070223; JP 2006505520 A 20060216; JP 4533139 B2 20100901; PT 1537114 E 20061229; US 2006166973 A1 20060727; US 7732603 B2 20100608

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160801

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160719

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160725

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160811

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160831

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-07-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-09-25 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: NOVARTIS TIERGESUNDHEIT AG, CH

- Effective date: 20150820

2015-09-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60307483

- Representative's name: OFFICE FREYLINGER S.A., LU

2015-06-19 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: NOVARTIS TIERGESUNDHEIT AG

- Effective date: 20150615

2015-06-19 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: NOVARTIS TIERGESUNDHEIT AG

- Effective date: 20150717

2015-05-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: NOVARTIS TIERGESUNDHEIT AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: NOVARTIS AG, BASEL, CH

- Document: DE 60307483

- Effective date: 20150417

2015-05-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: NOVARTIS TIERGESUNDHEIT AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: NOVARTIS AG, 4056 BASEL, CH

- Document: DE 60307483

- Effective date: 20150417

2015-05-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60307483

- Representative's name: BALIBEY, RENE, DE

- Effective date: 20140313

2015-05-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60307483

- Representative's name: BALIBEY, RENE, DE

- Effective date: 20150417

2015-05-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60307483

- Representative's name: DR. SCHOEN, NEYMEYR & PARTNER MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20150417

2015-05-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60307483

- Representative's name: DR. SCHOEN, NEYMEYR & PARTNER MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20150521

2015-05-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60307483

- Representative's name: DR. SCHOEN, NEYMEYR & PARTNER MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20140313

2015-05-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60307483

- Representative's name: OFFICE FREYLINGER S.A., LU

- Effective date: 20150417

2015-05-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60307483

- Representative's name: OFFICE FREYLINGER S.A., LU

- Effective date: 20150521

2015-05-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60307483

- Representative's name: OFFICE FREYLINGER S.A., LU

- Effective date: 20140313

2015-04-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60307483

- Representative's name: BALIBEY, RENE, DE

2015-04-08 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20150312 AND 20150318

2014-03-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60307483

- Representative's name: BALIBEY, RENE, DE

2013-07-31 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110630

2013-01-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100806

2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100807

2012-09-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100806

2011-08-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-07-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100806

2011-06-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110302

2011-05-31 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100806

2011-05-31 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100807

2011-05-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100806

2011-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-05-31 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110207

2011-05-31 [PG25 RO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100806

2011-05-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100806

2011-05-31 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100806

2011-05-31 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100806

2011-05-06 [REG SK MM4A] PATENT LAPSED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF MAINTENANCE FEES

- Document: SK E 2151

- Effective date: 20100806

2011-04-29 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20110314

2011-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-04-29 [PG25 HU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100807

2011-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-04-15 [REG EE MM4A] LAPSED BY NOT PAYING THE ANNUAL FEES

- Document: EE E000670

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-03-29 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-03-28 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2011-03-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *NOVARTIS A.G.

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-02-15 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20110207

2010-05-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20090717

- Year of fee payment: 7

2010-03-31 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20090721

- Year of fee payment: 7

2010-02-26 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090825

- Year of fee payment: 7

2010-01-29 [PGFP BG] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Payment date: 20090730

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090812

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-11-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090814

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-11-30 [PGFP CZ] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Payment date: 20090728

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-11-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20090813

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-11-30 [PGFP HU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Payment date: 20090727

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-11-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20090824

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090803

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20090806

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-11-30 [PGFP RO] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Payment date: 20090710

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090806

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-11-30 [PGFP SI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Payment date: 20090713

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-11-30 [PGFP SK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Payment date: 20090713

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-11-30 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20090710

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-10-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20090813

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-10-30 [PGFP EE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Payment date: 20090715

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-10-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20090818

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-10-30 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20090729

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080806

2007-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070510

2007-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2270143 T3

2007-03-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-02-23 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1080290

2006-12-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20061106

2006-12-15 [REG EE FG4A] TRANSLATION OF THE SPECIFICATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT VALID IN ESTONIA

- Document: EE E000670

- Effective date: 20061101

2006-11-28 [REG HU AG4A] FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS

- Document: HU E000735

2006-11-23 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20060403668

2006-11-21 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-11-13 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2006-09-29 [REG RO EPE] EP PATENT VALID IN ROMANIA

2006-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60307483 P 20060921

2006-09-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2006-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-08-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-08-09 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060809

2006-07-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS AG

2006-07-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS PHARMA GMBH

2006-04-21 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1080290

2005-11-30 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2005-08-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050621

2005-06-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050307

2005-06-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-06-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK