Global Patent Index - EP 1537988 B1

EP 1537988 B1 2009-02-11 - Bottom dead centre correction device for servo press machines

Title (en)

Bottom dead centre correction device for servo press machines

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Einstellen der Lage des untersten Totpunktes für eine mit Servomotor angetriebene Presse

Title (fr)

Dispositif de correction de la position du point mort inférieur pour presse entraînée par un servo-moteur

Publication

EP 1537988 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 05003258 A

Priority

EP 00309570 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1537988A2] A bottom dead center correction device for a servo press machine which can correct the bottom dead center with a high precision not achieved by a bottom dead center correction by a slide position detection device provided on a frame includes a bottom dead center sensor 11 and a temperature sensor 12 on a lower mold 10B of a die 10. The bottom dead center of a set slide motion of slide 3 is corrected by the bottom dead center measurement value of bottom dead center detection sensor 11 and by the temperature drift of bottom dead center detection sensor 11 resulting from the rise of die 10 due to molding and detected by temperature sensor 12. A bottom dead center correction of one micron unit not previously achieved becomes possible. The bottom dead center correction device also can be provided as one which corrects for the fluctuations in the bottom dead center resulting from deformations in all of the construction parts and the die of the servo press. It includes a current detection device 8 which detects the current value supplied to a servo motor 5 to a screw shaft 4 which joins with a slide 3. A scale detection device 9 detects the position of slide 3. There is feedback of outputs from a current detection device 8 and a scale detection device 9 to a NC control device 6. When or the other of either the load value calculated from the current value or the slide position reaches a set value, a correction value is obtained corresponding to the difference between the other value and its set value. The bottom dead center precision can be improved to the range of 1-few microns. <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B30B 15/14 (2006.01); B30B 1/18 (2006.01); B30B 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B30B 15/0041 (2013.01); B30B 1/186 (2013.01); B30B 15/0094 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1537988 A2 20050608; EP 1537988 A3 20050629; EP 1537988 B1 20090211; DE 60041447 D1 20090312; DE 60041559 D1 20090326

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-08-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60041559

- Effective date: 20140501

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121030

2013-06-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121030

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121024

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101025

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091112

2009-03-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60041559 P 20090326

2009-02-11 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1201416 P

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2009-02-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070316

2006-03-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2005-06-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2005-06-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050216

2005-06-08 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1201416 P

2005-06-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB