Global Patent Index - EP 1538447 B1

EP 1538447 B1 2007-10-31 - Reagent container

Title (en)

Reagent container

Title (de)

Reagenzbehälter

Title (fr)

Récipient à réactifs

Publication

EP 1538447 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 04028351 A

Priority

JP 2003406682 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1538447A2] A reagent container used for automatic analysis in an automatic analyzer, which enables reagents to be set with ease and which can increase flexibility in selecting combinations of the reagents. In an automatic analyzer for analyzing components of a biological sample by using two or more kinds of reagents, reagent containers containing the two or more kinds of reagents are jointed into one reagent cassette with the aid of a recess and a projection provided in and on the reagent containers, a reagent holder, bonding, tape binding, etc. Thus, a plurality of reagents used for one analysis item are combined with each other in one cassette corresponding to one analysis item. A reagent container for use in automatic analysis, which is easy to handle and highly flexible in setting of reagents, can be provided.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 35/02 (2006.01); G01N 35/10 (2006.01); B01L 3/08 (2006.01); B65D 21/02 (2006.01); G01N 35/00 (2006.01); G01N 35/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 35/1002 (2013.01); B01L 3/08 (2013.01); B65D 21/0202 (2013.01); B01L 2200/028 (2013.01); G01N 2035/0443 (2013.01); G01N 2035/0451 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1538447 A2 20050608; EP 1538447 A3 20060426; EP 1538447 B1 20071031; CN 1624485 A 20050608; DE 602004009744 D1 20071213; DE 602004009744 T2 20080828; JP 2005164509 A 20050623; US 2005142040 A1 20050630

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161014

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161123

- Year of fee payment: 13

2016-10-14 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 13

2015-10-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080801

2008-07-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-12-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602004009744 P 20071213

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2007-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2006-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060725

2006-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2006-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK YU

2005-06-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-06-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK YU