Global Patent Index - EP 1539630 A4

EP 1539630 A4 2009-02-25 - ELEVATOR EMPLOYING RADIO FREQUENCY IDENTIFICATION DEVICES (RFIDS)

Title (en)

ELEVATOR EMPLOYING RADIO FREQUENCY IDENTIFICATION DEVICES (RFIDS)

Title (de)

HOCHFREQUENZIDENTIFIKATIONSVORRICHTUNGEN (RFIDS) EINSETZENDER AUFZUG

Title (fr)

ASCENSEUR UTILISANT DES DISPOSITIFS D'IDENTIFICATION PAR RADIOFREQUENCE

Publication

EP 1539630 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 02761210 A

Priority

US 0224357 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2004013030A1] An elevator safety chain includes a plurality of passive radio frequency identification devices (RFIDs) (15-18, 22, 34-36 and 63), which are associated, respectively, with hoistway door locks, upper hoistway limits, lower hoistway limits, overspeed detection, car door lock, emergency stop switch, and inspection switch. RFIDs may be associated with car call buttons (34) and/or hall call buttons (14, 19). The RFIDs may have a switch (43, 44) in the frequency-determining circuitry (40, 41) which defeats the RFID's ability to respond, or a switch (48) which alters the responding frequency. The RFIDs may sense safe or unsafe conditions, or call requests, by either the presence of absence, or vice versa, of adjacent magnetic reluctance (51, 62, 71).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 13/00; B66B 3/00; B66B 13/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 3/00 (2006.01); B66B 1/34 (2006.01); B66B 5/00 (2006.01); B66B 13/00 (2006.01); B66B 13/22 (2006.01); B66B 13/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 1/34 (2013.01); B66B 1/3415 (2013.01); B66B 1/3453 (2013.01); B66B 13/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 2004013030 A1 20040212; AU 2002326490 A1 20040223; BR 0215827 A 20050607; BR 0215827 B1 20110222; CN 100519390 C 20090729; CN 1642840 A 20050720; DE 60239427 D1 20110421; EP 1539630 A1 20050615; EP 1539630 A4 20090225; EP 1539630 B1 20110309; ES 2359630 T3 20110525; HK 1077798 A1 20100416; JP 2005534591 A 20051117; JP 4205057 B2 20090107

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170719

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170719

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60239427

- Representative's name: SCHMITT-NILSON SCHRAUD WAIBEL WOHLFROM PATENTA, DE

2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150802

2017-02-03 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170203

2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150831

2016-06-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160429

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150801

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140822

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140808

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-11-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140711

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-04-05 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60239427

- Effective date: 20111212

2012-02-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20111212

2011-05-25 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2359630 T3

- Effective date: 20110525

2011-04-21 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 60239427

- Effective date: 20110421

2011-04-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60239427 P 20110421

2011-03-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2011-03-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2009-12-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20091110

2009-02-25 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090122

2006-08-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VECCHIOTTI, ALBERTO

2006-08-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BACELLAR, ADRIANA

2006-08-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BACELLAR, LUIZ

2006-08-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HAAS, DEBORAH

2006-08-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NETTER, CHRISTIAN

2006-08-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STUCKY, PAUL

2006-08-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VERONESI, WILLIAM, A.

2006-08-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ZACCHIO, JOSEPH

2006-08-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ZEPKE, BRUCE

2005-11-23 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2005-11-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-06-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050125

2005-06-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2005-06-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI