Global Patent Index - EP 1541470 B1

EP 1541470 B1 2007-10-17 - Device for applying a longitudinal strap around an object such as in particular a bundle of newspapers or magazines

Title (en)

Device for applying a longitudinal strap around an object such as in particular a bundle of newspapers or magazines

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Längsumreifen eines Packstücks wie insbesondere eines Stapels von Zeitungen, Magazinen od.dgl.

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour appliquer une bande de cerclage longitudinale autour d'un objet, comme en particulier une pile de journaux ou magazines

Publication

EP 1541470 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 04026791 A

Priority

DE 10357829 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1541470A1] The device uses a band-like strap (14) and has a conveyor for the paper stack, and a strapping station with a frame-like strap guide channel. The channel is formed by corner deflectors, moving the strap through 90[deg], guide channel sections, which only support the strap on its outer sides, and shorter intermediate twisting parts (23,24,25,27,28), which twist the strap about its longitudinal axis, by approx. 40-60[deg], esp. approx. 45[deg]. The corner deflectors form a channel open on one side, and the strap can be pulled out to tighten it around the paper stack.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 13/06 (2006.01); B65B 27/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 27/08 (2013.01); B65B 13/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1541470 A1 20050615; EP 1541470 B1 20071017; CA 2489974 A1 20050609; CA 2489974 C 20090203; DE 10357829 A1 20050728; DE 502004005252 D1 20071129; US 2005139092 A1 20050630; US 7150222 B2 20061219

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-09-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 502004005252

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-08-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120731

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101126

- Year of fee payment: 7

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101223

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071017

2008-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080718

2008-06-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-05-14 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

2007-11-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502004005252 P 20071129

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-10-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-10-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHUETTLER, KARL

2007-10-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: OZGA, JOERG

2007-10-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHNEIDER-PFAFFENBERGER, INGRID

2006-03-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-12-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20051010

2005-06-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-06-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL HR LT LV MK YU