Global Patent Index - EP 1541861 A3

EP 1541861 A3 2007-10-24 - Fuel injection valve

Title (en)

Fuel injection valve

Title (de)

Kraftstoffeinspritzventil

Title (fr)

Soupape d'injection de combustible

Publication

EP 1541861 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 04106238 A

Priority

DE 10357768 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1541861A2] The fuel injection valve (1) has a transmission element (7) axially movable in a bore (4) installed between the valve actuator (2) and a leakage chamber (3). The transmission element has a first section (8) lying against the actuator and a second section (9) constructed as a protrusion facing the valve (5). A bellows (10) is fastened by a first end on the protrusion and by a second end fastened to the wall of the bore housing the transmission element, with encompassing sealing action in each case so that the bellows seals the actuator against the leakage chamber.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 59/46 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 63/0035 (2013.01); F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 63/0026 (2013.01); F02M 2200/16 (2013.01); F02M 2200/707 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR LV MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1541861 A2 20050615; EP 1541861 A3 20071024

INPADOC legal status


2014-03-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130917

2013-05-29 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20130506

2013-05-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F02M 47/02 20060101ALI20130325BHEP

2013-05-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F02M 63/00 20060101AFI20130325BHEP

2010-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100224

2008-11-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2008-10-01 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2008-07-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2008-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH

2008-01-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20071214

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR LV MK YU

2005-06-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-06-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR LV MK YU