Global Patent Index - EP 1544157 B1

EP 1544157 B1 2009-02-11 - Filling machine for filling containers

Title (en)

Filling machine for filling containers

Title (de)

Füllmaschine zum Füllen von Behältern

Title (fr)

Machine de remplissage pour remplir des récipients

Publication

EP 1544157 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 04029312 A

Priority

DE 10359312 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1544157A1] The filling machine has in the filler pipe which connects with the container neck a first gas channel (14) for supplying and removing process gases as well as further media. Either this gas channel or a further gas and fluid channel (15) is infinitely adjustable in height to determine the filling level and is set up for discharging or supplying a pressurised gas above the pretensioning pressure. The gas channel can be adjusted independently of the gas channels of the other filler elements (3).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67C 3/10 (2006.01); B67C 3/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67C 3/10 (2013.01); B67C 3/262 (2013.01); B67C 2003/2668 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT SI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1544157 A1 20050622; EP 1544157 B1 20090211; DE 10359312 A1 20050728; DE 10359312 B4 20160225; DE 502004008961 D1 20090326; SI 1544157 T1 20090630

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 14

2018-02-28 [PGFP SI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Payment date: 20171127

- Year of fee payment: 14

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 14

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171211

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-12-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2015-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-12-23 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: KHS GMBH

- Effective date: 20111122

2011-10-28 [REG SI SP73] CHANGE OF DATA ON OWNER

- Owner name: KHS GMBH; DE

- Effective date: 20110920

2010-01-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091112

2009-03-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502004008961 P 20090326

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SI

2007-03-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20051123

2006-04-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KHS AG

2006-03-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SI

2005-09-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050714

2005-06-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-06-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR LV MK YU