Global Patent Index - EP 1544440 B8

EP 1544440 B8 2010-02-17 - PRIME MOVER CONTROLLER OF A CONSTRUCTION MACHINE.

Title (en)

PRIME MOVER CONTROLLER OF A CONSTRUCTION MACHINE.

Title (de)

ANTRIEBSAGGREGATSTEUERUNG EINER BAUMASCHINE.

Title (fr)

CONTRÔLEUR DU MOTEUR D'UN ENGIN DE TRAVAUX.

Publication

EP 1544440 B8 (EN)

Application

EP 02807863 A

Priority

JP 0209966 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1544440A1] A prime mover control device of a construction machine according to the present invention includes a hydraulic pump (11) driven by a prime mover (40), a hydraulic traveling motor (5) driven with pressure oil output from the hydraulic pump (11), and a control valve (12) that controls a flow of the pressure oil from the hydraulic pump (11) to the hydraulic motor (5) in response to an operation of an operating member (22a). The prime mover control device further includes a deceleration detection means (31) that detects a deceleration operation at the operating member (22a), a rotation speed detection means (35) that detects a rotation speed Nm of the hydraulic motor (5), and a prime mover rotation speed control means (30,43) that executes speed reduction control of the rotation speed of the prime mover (40) based upon detection results provided by the rotation speed detection means (35) if the deceleration operation is detected by the deceleration detection means (31) and controls the rotation speed of the prime mover (40) in correspondence to an operation of the operating member (22a) which is detected to be other than the deceleration operation. <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 29/00 (2006.01); B60K 17/10 (2006.01); E02F 9/22 (2006.01); F02D 11/10 (2006.01); F02D 29/02 (2006.01); F02D 31/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 31/001 (2013.01); B60K 17/10 (2013.01); B60W 10/06 (2013.01); B60W 10/10 (2013.01); B60W 30/18136 (2013.01); E02F 9/2246 (2013.01); E02F 9/2253 (2013.01); E02F 9/226 (2013.01); E02F 9/2296 (2013.01); F02D 11/105 (2013.01); F02D 29/00 (2013.01); F02D 29/02 (2013.01); F16H 61/4148 (2013.01); F16H 61/4157 (2013.01); B60W 10/103 (2013.01); B60W 2300/17 (2013.01); B60W 2540/10 (2013.01); B60W 2710/0644 (2013.01); F02D 41/12 (2013.01); F02D 2200/1012 (2013.01); F02D 2200/602 (2013.01); F02D 2200/702 (2013.01); F16H 59/40 (2013.01); F16H 2059/186 (2013.01); F16H 2059/6876 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1544440 A1 20050622; EP 1544440 A4 20070418; EP 1544440 B1 20090603; EP 1544440 B8 20100217; CN 100354513 C 20071212; CN 1668835 A 20050914; DE 60232553 D1 20090716; JP 3902627 B2 20070411; JP WO2004029435 A1 20060126; US 2006096799 A1 20060511; US 7273124 B2 20070925; WO 2004029435 A1 20040408

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170920

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-09-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170814

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160816

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-08-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090926

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090926

2010-05-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100304

2010-03-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD.

- Effective date: 20100106

2010-01-06 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD.

2009-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090903

2009-07-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60232553 P 20090716

2009-06-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2009-06-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2009-04-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SATAKE, HIDETOSHI

2009-04-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ICHIMURA, KAZUHIRO

2009-04-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TATSUNO, YUKIHIRO

2008-08-27 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PRIME MOVER CONTROLLER OF A CONSTRUCTION MACHINE.

2007-12-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071121

2007-04-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20070319

2007-04-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F02D 29/00 20060101AFI20040414BHEP

2007-04-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E02F 9/22 20060101ALI20070313BHEP

2006-01-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2005-06-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050322

2005-06-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR