EP 1544524 A1 20050622 - Valve with a closing member comprising shape memory material and use of such a valve
Title (en)
Valve with a closing member comprising shape memory material and use of such a valve
Title (de)
Ventil mit einem Formgedächtniswerkstoff aufweisenden Ventilverschlusskörper und Verwendung eines derartigen Ventils
Title (fr)
Soupape avec un élément obturateur comportant un matériau à mémoire de forme et utilisation d'une telle soupape
Publication
Application
Priority
EP 03104785 A 20031218
Abstract (en)
The valve has a valve body (1) consisting of at least one shape memory material, so that it can be transformed from a first into a second configuration, e.g. a closed and an open position. The valve body has a main body of mainly aluminum or plastic, and the shape memory material is imbedded in it, pref. the form of fibers. The material is controlled by temperature, with at least one transitional temperature acting as transformation point, or alternatively, by a magnetic field with a transitional magnetic field strength. The shape memory material is one of the following group:- NiTi (nitinol), Fe-Pt, Cu-Al-Ni, Fe-Pd, Fe-Ni, Cu-Zn-Al, CuAlMn, ceramics, esp. Ce-TZP-ceramics.
Abstract (de)
Die Erfindung betrifft ein Ventil (100), das dadurch gekennzeichnet ist, daß der mindestens eine Ventilverschlußkörper (1) mindestens einen Formgedächtniswerkstoff aufweist, so daß der Ventilverschlußkörper (1) mindestens von einer ersten Konfiguration in eine zweite Konfiguration transformierbar ist, wobei eine der beiden Konfigurationen die Schließstellung des Ventils (100) und die andere Konfiguration die Offenstellung des Ventils (100) darstellt, in der das Ventil (100) für Fluide durchlässig ist. Verwendet wird ein derartiges Ventil (100) im Automobilbereich, insbesondere bei Brennkraftmaschinen. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
F16K 31/00 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
F16K 31/002 (2013.01)
Citation (applicant)
Arndt,Griebel und Roubicek in ihrem artikel "Modelling and numerical simulation of martensic transformation in shape memory alloys", der am 27 juni 2003 im Internet veröffentlicht wurde.
Citation (search report)
- [X] DE 20114702 U1 20020117 - 1ST MEMORY ALLOYS GMBH [DE]
- [X] US 2003181853 A1 20030925 - SEWARD KIRK PATRICK [US]
- [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 331 (M - 1282) 20 July 1992 (1992-07-20)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 008, no. 054 (M - 282) 10 March 1984 (1984-03-10)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 006, no. 026 (M - 112) 16 February 1982 (1982-02-16)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 008, no. 189 (M - 321) 30 August 1984 (1984-08-30)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 03104785 A 20031218