EP 1545493 A4 20060111 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS TO TREAT CONDITIONS ASSOCIATED WITH NEOVASCULARIZATION
Title (en)
METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS TO TREAT CONDITIONS ASSOCIATED WITH NEOVASCULARIZATION
Title (de)
VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ERKRANKUNGEN IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT NEOVASKULARISIERUNG
Title (fr)
PROCEDES ET COMPOSITIONS POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'ETATS ASSOCIES A LA NEOVASCULARISATION
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 0324455 W 20030805
- US 40113002 P 20020805
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2004012677A2] This invention provides a method to inhibit neovascularization in tissue by delivering to the cell or tissue an effective amount of sulforaphane, or a pharmaceutically acceptable salt, derivative or prodrug thereof. Also provided herein is a method for treating a disease associated with hyperproliferation of endothelial cells and/or neovascularization by administering to a subject an effective amount of sulforaphane, or a pharmaceutically acceptable salt, derivative or prodrug thereof. Kits to treat patients are provided as well.
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
A61K 31/21 (2006.01); A61K 31/26 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
A61K 31/21 (2013.01); A61K 31/26 (2013.01); A61P 9/00 (2017.12); A61P 17/00 (2017.12); A61P 17/02 (2017.12); A61P 17/06 (2017.12); A61P 19/02 (2017.12); A61P 27/02 (2017.12); A61P 27/06 (2017.12); A61P 29/00 (2017.12); A61P 35/00 (2017.12); A61P 37/06 (2017.12)
Citation (search report)
- [X] WO 0045829 A1 20000810 - WASSEN INT LTD [GB], et al
- [X] GAMET-PAYRASTRE LAURENCE ET AL: "Sulforaphane, a naturally occurring isothiocyanate, induces cell cycle arrest and apoptosis in HT29 human colon cancer cells", CANCER RESEARCH, vol. 60, no. 5, 1 March 2000 (2000-03-01), pages 1426 - 1433, XP002353391, ISSN: 0008-5472
- [X] FIMOGNARI CARMELA ET AL: "Growth inhibition, cell-cycle arrest and apoptosis in human T-cell leukemia by the isothiocyanate sulforaphane", CARCINOGENESIS (OXFORD), vol. 23, no. 4, April 2002 (2002-04-01), pages 581 - 586, XP002353392, ISSN: 0143-3334
- [X] CHIAO J W ET AL: "Sulforaphane and its metabolite mediate growth arrest and apoptosis in human prostate cancer cells", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ONCOLOGY, vol. 20, no. 3, March 2002 (2002-03-01), pages 631 - 636, XP009056886, ISSN: 1019-6439
- [X] LUND ELIZABETH K ET AL: "Cell death in the colorectal cancer cell line HT29 in response to glucosinolate metabolites", JOURNAL OF THE SCIENCE OF FOOD AND AGRICULTURE, vol. 81, no. 9, July 2001 (2001-07-01), pages 959 - 961, XP002353393, ISSN: 0022-5142
- [X] MATUSHESKI NATHAN V ET AL: "Comparison of the bioactivity of two glucoraphanin hydrolysis products found in broccoli, sulforaphane and sulforaphane nitrile", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, vol. 49, no. 12, December 2001 (2001-12-01), pages 5743 - 5749, XP002353573, ISSN: 0021-8561
- See references of WO 2004012677A2
Citation (examination)
ZHANG YUESHENG; KENSLER THOMAS W; CHO CHEON-GYU; POSNER GARY H; TALALAY PAUL: "Anticarcinogenic activities of sulforaphane and structurally related synthetic norbornyl isothiocyanates", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI, vol. 91, no. 8, 1994, pages 3147 - 3150
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2004012677 A2 20040212; WO 2004012677 A3 20050224; AU 2003263988 A1 20040223; AU 2003263988 A8 20040223; CN 1723017 A 20060118; EP 1545493 A2 20050629; EP 1545493 A4 20060111; JP 2006508047 A 20060309; TW 200407119 A 20040516
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 0324455 W 20030805; AU 2003263988 A 20030805; CN 03823747 A 20030805; EP 03767196 A 20030805; JP 2004526444 A 20030805; TW 92121415 A 20030805