Global Patent Index - EP 1549901 B1

EP 1549901 B1 2009-02-18 - SEALING BAND FOR PROJECTILE AND AMMUNITION PROVIDED WITH SUCH A BAND

Title (en)

SEALING BAND FOR PROJECTILE AND AMMUNITION PROVIDED WITH SUCH A BAND

Title (de)

DICHTUNGSBAND FÜR GESCHOSSE UND MUNITION, DIE MIT SOLCH EINEM BAND BEREITGESTELLT WERDEN

Title (fr)

CEINTURE D'ETANCHEITE POUR PROJECTILE ET MUNITION EQUIPEE D'UNE TELLE CEINTURE

Publication

EP 1549901 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 03787838 A

Priority

  • FR 0301941 W
  • FR 0209505 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2004017015A1] The invention relates to the technical field of sealing bands for a projectile, especially a sub-calibre projectile. Said band (9) is characterised in that it comprises a front sub-band (11) having at least two sectors, whereby said sub-band has at least one conical profile (13a, 13b) which interacts with a complementary profile (14a, 14b) of a projectile groove (1) with the cone vertex arranged on the side of a rear part (AR) of the projectile and whereby said sub-band is maintained on the projectile by a cylindrical skirt (12). Said invention also relates to a projectile and ammunition provided with said band.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 14/02 (2006.01); F42B 14/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 14/02 (2013.01); F42B 14/061 (2013.01); F42B 14/067 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2842896 A1 20040130; FR 2842896 B1 20041022; AU 2003260624 A1 20040303; DE 60326254 D1 20090402; EP 1549901 A1 20050706; EP 1549901 B1 20090218; IL 166406 A 20120531; IL 166406 D0 20060115; US 2006032394 A1 20060216; US 7503262 B2 20090317; WO 2004017015 A1 20040226

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170526

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170522

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110625

2012-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110630

2012-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110630

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110624

2012-02-07 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100525

- Year of fee payment: 8

2010-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100525

- Year of fee payment: 8

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100603

- Year of fee payment: 8

2010-01-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091119

2009-06-09 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2009-04-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60326254 P 20090402

2009-03-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ING. MARCO ZARDI C/O M. ZARDI & CO. S.A.

2009-02-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI SE

2009-02-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-04-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NEXTER MUNITIONS

2005-11-16 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2005-11-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI SE

2005-07-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050110

2005-07-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2005-07-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK